Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Santana et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Elizabeth Santana and San Antonio Bakery, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03772
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Elizabeth Santana served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. San Antonio Bakery, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to San Antonio Bakery, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Santana. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Lonstein, Julie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against San Antonio Bakery, Inc., Elizabeth Santana filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11618695, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Defendant, Elizabeth Santana, #3 Proposed Summons as to Defendant, San Antonio Bakery, Inc.) (Lonstein, Julie) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Santana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Bakery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?