Kayton et. al. v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Andrew Kayton, Jr. and Michele Gordon
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv06301
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order Discovery Plan Worksheet by Target Corporation (Leibowitz, Allison)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/8/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/12/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court of State of NY, Suffolk County, 612967/2019; Received Clerks Minutes and Notice of Removal. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Jannace on behalf of Target Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jannace, Steven)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, and Civil Cover Sheet (Leibowitz, Allison)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Supreme Court, Suffolk County, case number 612967/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12022489) Was the Disclosure Statement completed on the Civil Cover Sheet?- Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leibowitz, Allison) Modified on 11/7/2019 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayton et. al. v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Allison C. Leibowitz
Represented By: Steven D. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Kayton, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. DaVolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Gordon
Represented By: Richard J. DaVolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?