New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton et al
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton Building Department, The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton and The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board
Case Number: 2:2020cv03555
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
2 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E Wright on behalf of The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board, The Town of East Hampton Building Department (aty to be noticed) (Wright, Kelly)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DEADLINES AND COURT APPEARANCES. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/15/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/14/2021. The Discovery Status Conference will be held on June 9, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 840. The Case Management and Scheduling Order will be entered separately. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. (Ameri, Mana)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER regarding #16 : The Initial Conference scheduled for January 14, 2021 will be conducted telephonically. Counsel are requested to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at 866-590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/13/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Wilbur, Kenneth)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this action to this Court, an Initial Conference is set for January 14, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The Court will provide advance notice as to the manner in which the conference will be conducted. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the Court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/28/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL: it is requested that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to a randomly selected Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/9/2020. (Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson for all further proceedings.) (Florio, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/9/2020. (FTR Log #11:03-11:04.) (Torres, Jasmine)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 Letter Regarding Initial Conference by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan) (Wilbur, Kenneth)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATT teleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. See Order and Attachments.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Initial Conference Protocol) (Torres, Jasmine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Wilbur on behalf of New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Wilbur, Kenneth)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/7/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth Wilbur Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13487131. by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth Wilbur, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kenneth Wilbur - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wilbur, Kenneth)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Roy Crouch on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Crouch, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Valle, Christine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Crouch, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER re #7 Stipulation filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.The parties' stipulation found at docket entry No. #7 , extending the Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is SO ORDERED. The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board, and The Town of East Hampton Building Department time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 9/22/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/9/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION regarding Response to Complaint by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Joseph, Andrew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020; The Town of East Hampton served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020; The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020; The Town of East Hampton Building Department served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020. (Joseph, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
August 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Joseph, Andrew) Modified on 8/7/2020 (Landow, Concetta).
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton, The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board, The Town of East Hampton Building Department filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13174946 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Joseph, Andrew) Modified on 8/7/2020 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Roy Crouch
Represented By: Kelly E Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton Building Department
Represented By: Thomas Roy Crouch
Represented By: Kelly E Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Planning Board of the Town of East Hampton
Represented By: Thomas Roy Crouch
Represented By: Kelly E Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton Architectural Review Board
Represented By: Thomas Roy Crouch
Represented By: Kelly E Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC d/b/a AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Represented By: Kenneth J. Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?