The County of Westchester et. al. v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The City of Ogdensburg, The County of Otsego, The County of Yates, The County of Putnam, The County of Schuyler, The City of Lancaster, The County of Westchester, The County of Franklin, The County of Essex, The County of Cheektowaga, The County of Tompkins, The County of Cayuga, The County of Cattaraugus, The Town of Amherst, The City of Tonawanda, The County Of Nassau, The City of Rochester, The County of Tioga, The City of Amsterdam, The County of Allegany, The County of Saratoga, The County of Warren and The County of Schoharie
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03286
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-05467, filed 07/15/2021. (Florio, Lisa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 Certified JPMDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-3 filed on June 17, 2021, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action. The action is transferred to the Northern District of California for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (Florio, Lisa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 JPMDL ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-3 filed on June 17, 2021, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action. The action is transferred to the Northern District of California for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (Florio, Lisa)
July 13, 2021 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 Letter MOTION to Strike #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Cheifetz, David)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Amsterdam, The City of Lancaster, The City of Ogdensburg, The City of Rochester, The City of Tonawanda, The County Of Nassau, The County of Allegany, The County of Cattaraugus, The County of Cayuga, The County of Cheektowaga, The County of Essex, The County of Franklin, The County of Otsego, The County of Putnam, The County of Saratoga, The County of Schoharie, The County of Schuyler, The County of Tioga, The County of Tompkins, The County of Warren, The County of Westchester, The County of Yates, The Town of Amherst. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Certificate of Service) (Sacks, Shayna)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Stay. Consistent with this Court's decision in County of Genesee v. McKinsey & Co., 21-CV-1039, ECF No. 26 (E.D.N.Y. May 28, 2021), all proceedings and deadlines in this action are hereby STAYED pending resolution of Defendant's request to transfer to the MDL Proceeding. Landis v. North America Co., 299 U.S. 248, 254 (1936). Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/7/2021. (DiMarco, Nicholas)
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document /David Cheifetz Letter Motion for leave to file Motion to Stay Proceedings before Judge Seybert by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Cheifetz, David)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/24/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office re Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #400004/2021, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal or 8109(c) with order. (Coleman, Laurie)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to the Clerk of Court re: Request for Reassignment of Related Case by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Cheifetz, David)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Email Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Sacks, Shayna)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Email Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Badala, Salvatore)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Salvatore C. Badala, Esq., Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC, 400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305, Melville, New York, 11747 on June 11, 2021, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case No. 21-cv-01039 (JS)(SIL)is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Bernard, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Bernard, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 400004/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14556270). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Westchester County - POC, #4 Exhibit 4 - City of Amsterdam - POC, #5 Exhibit 5 - City of Ogdenburg - POC, #6 Exhibit 6 - City of Rochester - POC, #7 Exhibit 7 - County of Allegany - POC, #8 Exhibit 8 - County of Cattaraugus - POC, #9 Exhibit 9 - County of Cayuga - POC, #10 Exhibit 10 - County of Essex - POC, #11 Exhibit 11 - County of Franklin - POC, #12 Exhibit 12 - County of Nassau - POC, #13 Exhibit 13 - County of Otsego - POC, #14 Exhibit 14 - County of Putnam - POC, #15 Exhibit 15 - County of Saratoga - POC, #16 Exhibit 16 - County of Schoharie - POC, #17 Exhibit 17 - County of Schuyler - POC, #18 Exhibit 18 - County of Tioga - POC, #19 Exhibit 19 - County of Tompkins - POC, #20 Exhibit 20 - County of Warren - POC, #21 Exhibit 21 - County of Yates - POC, #22 Exhibit 22 - Town of Amherst - POC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Town of Cheektowaga - POC, #24 Exhibit 24 - Town of Lancaster - POC, #25 Exhibit 25 - Tonawanda - POC, #26 Exhibit 26 - Suffolk Index No.) (Bernard, James) Modified on 6/11/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Westchester et. al. v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Ogdensburg
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Otsego
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Yates
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Putnam
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Schuyler
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Lancaster
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Westchester
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Franklin
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Essex
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Cheektowaga
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Cayuga
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Cattaraugus
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Amherst
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Tonawanda
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County Of Nassau
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Rochester
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Tioga
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Amsterdam
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Allegany
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Saratoga
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Warren
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Schoharie
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore Charles Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?