Secure Signal, INC. et al v. The Lonstein Law Office, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: National Satellite Sports, Inc. and Secure Signal, INC.
Defendant: Steve Levine, Julie Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq., Martha Dymond, John and Jane Does, April Draganchuk, Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Herbert Lonstein, Signal Auditing, INC. and The Lonstein Law Office, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00268
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Ulster
Presiding Judge: David R. Homer
Referring Judge: Neal P McCurn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2008 Remark: Action Dismissed with Prejudice and Closed at Dkt 9 on April 10, 2008. (ptm, )
April 16, 2008 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by April Draganchuk, Martha Dymond, John and Jane Does, The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Signal Auditing, INC., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Herbert Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq., Steve Levine re #10 Stipulation of Dismissal, (Ferrara, Paul)
April 16, 2008 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by April Draganchuk, Martha Dymond, John and Jane Does, The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Signal Auditing, INC., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Herbert Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq., Steve Levine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Ferrara, Paul)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by National Satellite Sports, Inc., Secure Signal, INC., and DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Neal P. McCurn on 4/10/08. (lmp)
April 9, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Secure Signal, INC., National Satellite Sports, Inc. (Reilly, James)
March 20, 2008 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq. re #6 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, (Ferrara, Paul)
March 20, 2008 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcus W. Corwin Filing fee $30, receipt number 02060000000000969171. filed by The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Ferrara, Paul)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 3/18/2008. (mgh) Modified on 3/19/2008 (mgh).
March 12, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marcus W. Corwin Filing fee $30, receipt number 02060000000000969171. by Secure Signal, INC., National Satellite Sports, Inc.. Motions referred to David R. Homer. (Reilly, James)
March 7, 2008 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Civil Case Management Plan due by 6/30/2008. Initial Conference set for 7/8/2008 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge David R. Homer. (mgh)
March 7, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to April Draganchuk, Martha Dymond, The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Signal Auditing, INC., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Herbert Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq., Steve Levine. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Signal Auditintg, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Wayne Lonstein, Esq., #3 Summons Issued as to Julie Lonstein, #4 Summons Issued as to Herbert Lonstein, #5 Summons Issued as to Julie Lonstein, Esq., #6 Summons Issued as to Steve Levine, #7 Summons Issued as to April Draganchuk, #8 Summons Issued as to Martha Dymond)(mgh, )
March 7, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against April Draganchuk, Martha Dymond, John and Jane Does, The Lonstein Law Office, P.C., Signal Auditing, INC., Wayne Lonstein, Esq., Julie Lonstein, Herbert Lonstein, Julie Lonstein, Esq., Steve Levine (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0966294) filed by Secure Signal, INC., National Satellite Sports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secure Signal, INC. et al v. The Lonstein Law Office, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Satellite Sports, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secure Signal, INC.
Represented By: Marcus W. Corwin
Represented By: James M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lonstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Dymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Draganchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Lonstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal Auditing, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lonstein Law Office, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?