Lyons v. Clinton, et al
Plaintiff: |
William E. Lyons |
Defendant: |
Hillary Clinton, Archie Williams, Columbia County and New York State |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00215 |
Filed: |
February 24, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Albany Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas J. McAvoy |
Presiding Judge: |
Randolph F. Treece |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
22
DECISION AND ORDER granting Court's 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/8/11. (sfp, )
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
18
DECISION AND ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Treece's 17 Report and Recommendations; dismissing all the presently named Defendants from the 8 Amended Complaint; directing the Clerk to substitute "John Does" as Defendants in this action; directing Plaintiff to submit a Status Report within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/15/2011. (amt) [Pltf served via reg. mail]
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/10: ORDERING that the November 10, 2009 findings and recommendations, Dckt. No. 10, are vacated. RECOMMENDING that this action be transferred to the Northern District of New York. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one days. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2010.]
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing
10
[VACATED per order of 1/5/10]FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/10/09 RECOMMENDING that action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and for improper venue. Objections due within 20 days. (Owen, K) Modified on 1/5/2010 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2010.]
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/22/09 ORDERING Plaintiff to show cause, in a writing due on or before 11/4/09, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice or transferred to the Northern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). See Bennett v. Aurora Behavioral Health Care, 2009 WL 178489 (C.D. Cal. Jan. 26, 2009); Smith v. U.S. Dep't of Ed., 2007 WL 4357546 (N.D. Cal. Dec. 11, 2007). A failure to timely respond to this order to show cause will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2010.]
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/28/09 ORDERING Pltf's 2 request for leave to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Pltf is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Engbretson, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2010.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?