The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc. et al v. The State of New York et al
Plaintiff: John P. Moretti, Jr., Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh and The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc
Defendant: Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna, New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Civil Service Department, New York State and Local Retirement System and The State of New York
Case Number: 1:2011cv01526
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 44 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; adopting in part Report and rejecting in part Recommendations re # 53 Report and Recommendations. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/20/15. (ban)
August 17, 2014 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk modified the docket text in the # 56 docket entry to reflect that the filing is an Objection and not an Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Decision. The Clerk also removed the Motion hearing, Response, and Reply deadlines. No responses to be filed. (ban)
August 11, 2014 Filing 56 OBJECTION TO REPORT-RECOMMENDATION by Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna re # 53 Report and Recommendations, Order, Terminate Motions,,, Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2014 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 9/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Engel, Justin) Modified on 8/13/2014 to correctly label document (lah).
August 5, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Engel on behalf of Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna (Engel, Justin)
August 4, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Helena Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Helena)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the # 40 First MOTION to Amend/Correct the # 8 Amended Complaint is DENIED, and the parties are directed to use the following caption as noted herein in all further submissions. It is RECOMMENDED that the # 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/25/2014. (mc)
July 12, 2014 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna. (Sprague, Laura)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: It is hereby ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(B), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and Local Rule 72.3, Dependants' # 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Robert L. Megna, Andrew M. Cuomo, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Caroline W. Ahl, Thomas P. DiNapoli, be REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for the issuance of a Report-Recommendation and Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/10/14. (ban)
July 8, 2014 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (DeNigris, Stephen)
June 30, 2014 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 40 First MOTION to Amend/Correct # 8 Amended Complaint,, filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (DeNigris, Stephen)
June 11, 2014 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting # 47 Letter Request: ORDERED that the return date for # 44 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is reset for 7/15/14 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge Mae A. D'Agostino; No personal appearances are necessary. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. Response due 7/8/14; Reply due 7/15/14. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/11/14. (ban)
June 11, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to # 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . The Motion Hearing is reset for 7/15/2014 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino; Response to Motion due by 7/8/2014, Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/15/2014. (ban)
June 10, 2014 Filing 47 Unopposed Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' 12(c) Motion submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (DeNigris, Stephen)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER granting [Docket #45] Letter Request Unopposed Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York St : Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/8/2014. This motion is on submission. No oral argument is requested. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/6/14. (cjm, )
June 4, 2014 Filing 45 Unopposed Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Extension of Time submitted to Judge Hummel . (DeNigris, Stephen)
May 28, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2014 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 6/16/2014 Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/20/2014. filed by Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Appendix of unreported cases, # 3 Declaration of service) (Sprague, Laura)
May 28, 2014 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 40 First MOTION to Amend/Correct # 8 Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Law in Support of # 44 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of unreported cases, # 2 Declaration of service)(Sprague, Laura) Modified on 6/2/2014 (ban).
April 13, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh of Absence From the Jurisdiction (DeNigris, Stephen)
April 3, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to # 40 First MOTION to Amend/Correct # 8 Amended Complaint: Pursuant to Judge Hummel's 3/12/14 # 39 Text order, Response to Motion due by 5/28/2014, Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/9/2014. (ban)
March 27, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Kish on behalf of Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna (Kish, Rachel)
March 27, 2014 Filing 40 First MOTION to Amend/Correct # 8 Amended Complaint,, Motion Hearing (ON SUBMIT) set for 6/19/2014 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel Response to Motion due by 6/2/2014 filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation and Memorandum of Law, # 2 Proposed Amended Pleading, # 3 Exhibit(s) A to proposed amended pleading, # 4 Exhibit(s) B to proposed amended pleading, # 5 Exhibit(s) C to proposed amended pleading, # 6 Exhibit(s) D to proposed amended pleading, # 7 Exhibit(s) E to proposed amended pleading, # 8 Exhibit(s) F to proposed amended pleading, # 9 Exhibit(s) G to proposed amended pleading, # 10 Exhibit(s) H to proposed amended pleading) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Pursuant to the 3/11/2014 conference, it is Ordered that to the extent that any plaintiffs wish to file a Motion to Amend, such requests are GRANTED, Motions to Amend shall be filed by 3/28/2014, Response papers shall be filed by 5/28/2014, Reply papers shall be filed by 6/9/2014. To the extent that any plaintiffs wish to file a Motion for Class Certification, such requests are GRANTED. Motions for Class Certification shall be filed within 60 days of the Court's decision on the Motions to Amend, Response paper shall be filed within 60 days of the filing of any Motion for Class Certification, any Reply papers shall be filed within 14 days of the response papers. Discovery shall be HELD IN ABEYANCE pending resolution of the pending motions to amend except that plaintiffs may conduct limited discovery as noted herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/12/2014. (jmb)
March 11, 2014 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel (FTR Recorded: 10:30-11:00): Appearances: Steven DeNigres, Esq. & Richard E. Mulvaney, Esq. (Plaintiffs), Laura Sprague, Esq. Discovery Hearing held on 3/11/2014. Plaintiffs' counsel indicates clients wish to move for class certification. Briefing schedules set. Motion to amend schedule is as follows: Motions to be filed by 3/28; Responses by 5/28; Replies by 6/9. Motion for class certification schedule is as follows: Motions to be filed within 60 days of Court's decision on motion to amend; responding papers to be filed within 60 days of motion for class certification; reply papers to be filed within 14 days of responding papers. Discovery held in abeyance with limited exception regarding names of individuals involved in 1982 and 1983 collective bargaining agreements and their successors. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/21/14 is marked off the Court's calendar. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson)(aaf, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A. Sprague on behalf of Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna (Sprague, Laura)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: Pre Motion Scheduling Conference is set for 3/11/2014 10:30 AM in person in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/24/14. (cjm, )
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting # 36 Letter Request. The Joinder of Parties deadline is hereby extended to MARCH 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/21/2014. (lah)
January 21, 2014 Filing 36 Unopposed Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Pre-Motion Conference and Enlargement of Time submitted to Judge Hummel . (DeNigris, Stephen)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2014. Discovery due by 7/21/2014. Motions to be filed by 10/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/22/13. (cjm, )
October 18, 2013 Text Minute Entry (FTR recorded 10:00 am - 10:20 am) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 10/18/2013. Appearances: Stephen DeNigris, Esq., Charles Quakenbush, AAG. Deadlines set for the progression of the case. A Mid-Discovery Status Conference is set for 3/21/2014 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (cjm, )
October 7, 2013 Filing 34 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (DeNigris, Stephen)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER SETTING JOINT RULE 16 Initial Conference set for 10/18/2013 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for the present as well as all related cases. Civil Case Management Plan due by 10/8/2013. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/27/13. (cjm, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/18/2013 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for present as well as all related cases. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/27/13. (cjm, )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Transferring Case No. 1:13-CV-645 to U.S. District Judge D'Agostino and U.S. Magistrate Judge Hummel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 7/24/2013. (lah)
July 9, 2013 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying # 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/9/13. (ban)
March 28, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 26 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision/Order upon defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion. filed by defendants. (Quackenbush, Charles)
March 22, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 26 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision/Order upon defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion. filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exh A - RPEA Decision, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exh B - RPEA Petition, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exh C - Unreported Cases)(DeNigris, Stephen)
February 26, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to # 26 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision/Order upon defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion. . Response to Motion due by 3/22/2013, Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/28/2013. The Motion Hearing is reset for 4/2/2013 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban)
February 26, 2013 TEXT ORDER granting # 27 Letter Request: The response to the Motion for Reconsideration is due 3/22/13; Reply due 3/28/13; The return date is reset for 4/2/13 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge D'Agostino. No personal appearances are necessary. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. This is the final extension. No further extension requests will be entertained. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/26/13. (ban)
February 22, 2013 Filing 27 Consent Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (DeNigris, Stephen)
February 11, 2013 NOTICE: Rule 16 conference before Magistrate Judge Hummel will be held in abeyance pending a decision on the Dispositive Motion by Judge D'Agostino. Parties are to notify Judge Hummel's chambers if a Rule 16 conference is necessary upon a decision of the District Judge. (cjm, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision/Order upon defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2013 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 3/4/2013 filed by defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of AAG Charles J. Quackenbush, # 3 Appendix A to Quackenbush Declaration) (Quackenbush, Charles)
January 14, 2013 Ans. Deadlines terminated. (ban)
January 11, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to # 1 Complaint,, by defendants.(Quackenbush, Charles)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting # 24 Letter Request, Caroline W. Ahl answer due 1/11/2013; Andrew M. Cuomo answer due 1/11/2013; Thomas P. DiNapoli answer due 1/11/2013; J. Dennis Hanrahan answer due 1/11/2013; Patricia A. Hite answer due 1/11/2013; Robert L. Megna answer due 1/11/2013; New York State Civil Service Commission answer due 1/11/2013; New York State Civil Service Department answer due 1/11/2013; New York State and Local Retirement System answer due 1/11/2013; The State of New York answer due 1/11/2013; defendants answer due 1/11/2013 Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/17/12. (cjm, )
December 14, 2012 Filing 24 Letter Motion from AAG Charles J. Quackenbush for defendants requesting an extension of defendants' answer date to January 11, 2013 submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Quackenbush, Charles)
December 3, 2012 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction: ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint (Dkt. No. 14) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; it is further ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint as against the State of New York, New York State Civil Service Department, New York State Civil Service Commission and New York State and Local Retirement System is GRANTED. All claims against these defendants are dismissed; it is further ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims for monetary damages asserted against defendants Hite, Ahl, Hanrahan, Megna and DiNapoli in their official capacity is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs claims for injunctive and declaratory relief asserted against defendants Hite, Ahl, Hanrahan, Megna and DiNapoli in their official capacity is GRANTED only to the extent that such claims seek retrospective relief; it is further ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs Article 78 claims is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendants motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/3/12. (ban)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David R. Homer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/4/2012. (dpk)
August 24, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Decision and Order from USDC EDNY)(DeNigris, Stephen)
May 8, 2012 TEXT NOTICE. The Rule 16 Conference previously set for 6/26/2012 at 9:00 AM with Magistrate Judge Homer is ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE pending decision on the dispositive motion before the District Court.(lah, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction on behalf of all defendants filed by The State of New York. (Quackenbush, Charles)
April 25, 2012 Filing 19 Letter Motion from AAG Charles J. Quackenbush for The State of New York requesting an extension of defendants' 12(b) Reply date to April 27, 2012 submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Quackenbush, Charles)
April 25, 2012 TEXT ORDER granting # 19 Letter Request for an extension to file reply papers: Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/27/2012. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/25/12. (ban)
April 18, 2012 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction on behalf of all defendants filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh. (DeNigris, Stephen)
April 16, 2012 TEXT ORDER granting # 17 Letter Request: Plaintiff's are permitted to file a memorandum of law not to exceed 30 pages. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/16/12. (ban)
April 15, 2012 Filing 17 Letter Motion from Stephen G DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Permission to Exceed Memorandum of Law Page Limit to 30-Pages submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 16, 2012 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT regarding 03/16/12 SDNY preliminary injunction Decision/Order by The State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 (03/16/12 SDNY preliminary injunction Decision/Order))(Quackenbush, Charles)
March 6, 2012 TEXT ORDER granting # 15 Letter Request for an extension of time: The return date is adjourned to May 15, 2012 (ON SUBMIT). No personal appearances are necessary. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. Response due 4/18/12; Reply due 4/25/12. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/6/12. (ban)
March 6, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to # 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction on behalf of all defendants : Response to Motion due by 4/18/2012, Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/25/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2012 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban)
March 5, 2012 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Stephen G. DeNigris, Esq. for John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, Frederick W Scheidt, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., Robert Welsh requesting Enlargement of Time To File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 1, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction on behalf of all defendants Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 3/19/2012 Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/23/2012. filed by The State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of AAG Quackenbush, # 3 Appendix A to Quackenbush Declaration, # 4 Appendix B to Quackenbush Declaration, # 5 Appendix C to Quackenbush Declaration, # 6 Appendix D to Quackenbush Declaration, # 7 Appendix E to Quackenbush Declaration, # 8 Appendix F to Quackenbush Declaration, # 9 Appendix G to Quackenbush Declaration, # 10 Appendix H to Quackenbush Declaration, # 11 Appendix I to Quackenbush Declaration, # 12 Appendix J to Quackenbush Declaration, # 13 Appendix K to Quackenbush Declaration) (Quackenbush, Charles)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting # 12 Letter Request. Request is GRANTED up to 40 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 2/29/2012. (dpk)
February 28, 2012 Filing 12 Letter Motion from AAG Charles J. Quackenbush for The State of New York requesting permission to submit a Memorandum exceeding 25 pages upon defendants' Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge David R. Homer (on behalf of all defendants) . (Quackenbush, Charles)
February 15, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Mulvaney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mulvaney, Richard)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting # 7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 2/3/2012. (dpk)
January 29, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. DeNigris on behalf of Frederick W Scheidt, Robert Welsh (DeNigris, Stephen)
January 21, 2012 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ricky D. Palacios, Thomas H. Mungeer, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., John P. Moretti, Jr, Daniel M. Romano, Mark Robillard, Roland J. Russell, Robert Welsh, Frederick W Scheidt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit(s) Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit(s) Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit(s) Exh. F, # 7 Exhibit(s) Exh. G, # 8 Exhibit(s) Exh. H)(DeNigris, Stephen)
January 18, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard E Mulvaney Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2073514. filed by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc.. Motions referred to David R. Homer. (DeNigris, Stephen)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting # 6 Letter Request. Defendants' deadline to file an Answer or otherwise move with respect to plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to on or before MARCH 2, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 01/18/2012. (lah, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 6 Letter Motion from AAG Charles J. Quackenbush for Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna, New York State Civil Service Department, New York State Civll Service Commission, New York State and Local Retirement System, The State of New York requesting an extension of defendants' answer/motion date to March 2, 2012 submitted to Judge David R. Homer . (Quackenbush, Charles)
January 6, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John P. Moretti, Jr, Thomas H. Mungeer, Ricky D. Palacios, Mark Robillard, Daniel M. Romano, Roland J. Russell, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc. re # 1 Complaint,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exh. A - Sworn Affidavits of Service)(DeNigris, Stephen)
January 4, 2012 TEXT NOTICE. The Initial Rule 16 Conference previously set for 6/19/2012 at 2:00 PM with Magistrate Judge Baxter is RESCHEDULED to JUNE 26, 2012 at 9:00 AM with Magistrate Judge David R. Homer in Room 441, James Foley U.S. Courthouse, 445 Broadway, Albany. The Civil Case Management Plan shall be e-filed on or before June 20, 2012.(lah, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino and Magistrate Judge David R. Homer for all further proceedings. Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/29/2011. (mab)
December 29, 2011 TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to the # 4 Order Reassigning Case, counsel is no longer required to file the Notice of Related Case as previously directed in this matter. (mab)
December 28, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna, New York State Civil Service Department, New York State Civll Service Commission and New York State and Local Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to the New York State Civil Service Department, # 2 Summons Issued as to Patricia A. Hite, # 3 Summons Issued as to the New York State Civil Service Commission, # 4 Summons Issued as to Caroline W. Ahl, # 5 Summons Issued as to J. Dennis Hanrahan, # 6 Summons Issued as to Robert L. Megna, # 7 Summons Issued as to Thomas P. DiNapoli, # 8 Summons Issued as to the New York State and Local Retirement System) (dpk)
December 28, 2011 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/19/2012 at 2:00 PM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan due by 6/5/2012. (dpk)
December 28, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caroline W. Ahl, Andrew M. Cuomo, Thomas P. DiNapoli, J. Dennis Hanrahan, Patricia A. Hite, Robert L. Megna, New York State Civil Service Department, New York State Civll Service Commission, New York State and Local Retirement System and The State of New York (Filing fee $350 receipt number 2055974) filed by Ricky D. Palacios, Thomas H. Mungeer, The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc., John P. Moretti, Jr, Daniel M. Romano, Mark Robillard and Roland J. Russell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)
December 28, 2011 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/documents/GO12_withfillablenoticemtd.pdf (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc. et al v. The State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Moretti, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Mungeer
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky D. Palacios
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Robillard
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Romano
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland J. Russell
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W Scheidt
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Welsh
Represented By: Stephen G. DeNigris
Represented By: Richard E. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Police Benevolent Association of the New York State Troopers, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline W. Ahl
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. DiNapoli
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dennis Hanrahan
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Hite
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Megna
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Represented By: Justin L. Engel
Represented By: Rachel M. Kish
Represented By: Helena Lynch
Represented By: Laura A. Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Civil Service Commission
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Civil Service Department
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State and Local Retirement System
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Represented By: Charles J. Quackenbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?