Treistman v. Wacks, Esq. et al

Plaintiff: Ben Gary Treistman
Defendant: Valerie Lyn Wacks, Esq., Lawerence Shelton, Esq., Amy Greene, Kelly Whittaker, Elisabeth Krisjanis, Esq., Jillian Jackson, Esq., Barbara Sorkin, Denise Woltman, Charlene Boswell, Mary Ellen Schneider, Joseph Bennett, Other Unknown Named Persons and Ulster County Municipality
Cross_claimant: Elisabeth Krisjanis, Esq., Mary Ellen Schneider, Jillian Jackson, Esq., Denise Woltman, Joseph Bennett, Ulster County Municipality, Barbara Sorkin, Amy Greene, Charlene Boswell and Kelly Whittaker
Cross_defendant: Lawerence Shelton, Esq. and Valerie Lyn Wacks, Esq.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01897
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Ulster
Referring Judge: Christian F. Hummel
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - ORDERED that Counts I, II, III, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, XIV, and XV and Supplemental Counts I, II, IV, V, and X are dismissed as against remaining defendants; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's second amended complaint (Dkt. No. 98) isdismissed; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/9/2017. (Copy served via regular and certified)(jel, )
February 16, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Wach's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 109) is GRANTED and then Clerk is directed to terminate Wachs from this action. That municipal defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 90) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED with respect to claims against Krisjanis, Jackson, and Sorkin in their individual capacities. GRANTED with respect to claims against Ulster County and municipal defendants in their official capacities. DENIE D in all other respects. That Treistman's cross motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 94) is DENIED. That the Clerk is directed to terminate Krisjanis, Jackson, Sorkin and Ulster County from this action. That municipal defendants shall supple ment their motion and submit briefing consistent with this Memorandum-Decision and Order within fourteen (14) days of entry, Treistman shall have fourteen (14) days to respond, and municipal defendants shall have seven (7) days to reply. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/16/2017. (jel, )
November 26, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - ORDERED that municipal defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. No. 55) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as detailed below; and it is further ORDERED that Treistman's seventh cause o f action (Compl. 300-03) is DISMISSED in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED that Treistman's thirteenth and sixteenth causes of action (Compl. 324-29, 342-44) are DISMISSED as against the County; and it is further ORDERED th at Treistman's sixth, seventh, eighth, tenth, twelfth, thirteenth, sixteenth, and eighteenth causes of action (Compl. 298-99, 300-03, 304, 308-14, 322-23, 324-29, 342-44, 350-55) are DISMISSED as against CPS, DSS, and MHD; and it is furthe r ORDERED that Treistman's sixteenth cause of action (Compl. 342-44) is DISMISSED in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED that Treistman's eighteenth cause of action (Compl. 350-55) is DISMISSED insofar as it alleges a violation of due process rights; and it is further ORDERED that Shelton's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 56) is GRANTED and he is TERMINATED from this action; and it is further ORDERED that Wacks' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 57) is GRANTED and she is TERMINATED from this action; and it is further ORDERED that the parties contact Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel in order to schedule further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/26/2014. (jel, )
June 5, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMARY ORDER - That plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 12) is DENIED. That all claims asserted on behalf of A.T. are DISMISSED. That the Clerk TERMINATE A.T. as a plaintiff in this case. That the Clerk TERMINATE Cynthia Feathers, Esq. as attorney and guardian ad litem for A.T. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/5/2013. (jel, )
February 7, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED that the parties shall file briefs of five (5) pages or less and any supporting affidavits, declarations, or exhibits by Thursday, February 21, 2013 specifically addressing A.T.'s age and place of domicile, and any other matters they deem relevant to Treistmans purported representation of A.T. ORDERED that the application for an order to show cause (Dkt. No. 12) is STAYED. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/7/2013. (jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treistman v. Wacks, Esq. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Gary Treistman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Lyn Wacks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawerence Shelton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Greene
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Whittaker
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Krisjanis, Esq.
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Jackson, Esq.
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Sorkin
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Woltman
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Boswell
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Schneider
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bennett
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Named Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulster County Municipality
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Elisabeth Krisjanis, Esq.
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Mary Ellen Schneider
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Jillian Jackson, Esq.
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Denise Woltman
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Joseph Bennett
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Ulster County Municipality
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Barbara Sorkin
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Amy Greene
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Charlene Boswell
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Kelly Whittaker
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lawerence Shelton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Valerie Lyn Wacks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?