Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund et al v. Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Health Benefit Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Education & Training Fund, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund and Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC and Duane E. Moulton
Case Number: 1:2013cv00201
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Decision and Order issued by the Honorable David N. Hurd on July 12, 2016 (Dkt. No. 58 ), judgment is entered by the clerk in favor of the Plaintiffs and against Duane E. Moulton, Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC, and Northeast Specialty Constructors, LLC in the amount of $2,766.00. (rep)
July 7, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In favor of the Plaintiffs against Duane E. Moulton. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter default judgment in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant Duane E. Moulton in a total amount of $587,527.76. This includes $451, 300.52 in withheld fringe benefit contributions and deductions for the period of July 1, 2009, through March 31, 2013; $104,628.81 in prejudgment interest through October 21, 2013; $7,001.95 in attorneys' fees and costs in connection w ith the default judgment motion ($6,184.15 in attorneys' and paralegal fees and $817.80 in costs between February 12 and October 18, 2013), and $24,596.48 in attorneys' fees and costs in connection with the appeal ($20,939.75 in attorneys' and paralegal fees and $3,656.73 in costs between October 19, 2013 and April 23, 2015). (rep)
January 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT: in favor of Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Education & Training Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Health Benefit Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York, AFL-CIO and Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund against Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC and Duane E. Moulton in the total amount of $662,135.21. Amended in order to reflect the correct total amount awarded to plaintiff, as the original judgment contains an incorrect amount. (nmk)
January 3, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT: in favor of Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Education & Training Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Health Benefit Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York, AFL-CIO and Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund against Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC and Duane E. Moulton in the total amount of $622,135.21. (nmk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund et al v. Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Pension Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Health Benefit Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftsmen Local 2 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York Education & Training Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 2, Albany, New York, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moulton Masonry & Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane E. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?