Assembly Point Aviation, Inc. v. Richmor Aviation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Assembly Point Aviation, Inc.
Defendant: Richmor Aviation, Inc. and Mahlon W. Richards
Case Number: 1:2013cv00298
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Columbia
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Presiding Judge: Frederick J. Scullin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant's # 110 motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Court further ORDERS that Defendant's motion to certify the Court's May 19, 2017 Memorandum-Decision and Order fo r an interlocutory appeal to the Second Circuit Court of Appeals is DENIED. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's # 113 cross-motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 7/27/2017. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 7/27/2017. (nmk)
May 19, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's # 102 motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Rule 50 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion for a new trial pursuant to Rule 59 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS that the # 100 judgment in this case is VACATED. The Court further ORDERS that counsel shall participate in a telephone conference with the Court on June 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. to schedule a date for a new trial in this matter. The Court will provide counsel with the telephone number for the conference prior to the scheduled date. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 5/19/2017. (nmk)
July 28, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: in favor of Richmor Aviation, Inc. against Assembly Point Aviation, Inc. (nmk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assembly Point Aviation, Inc. v. Richmor Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assembly Point Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Henry
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmor Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Quinn
Represented By: William Ryan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahlon W. Richards
Represented By: Brian M. Quinn
Represented By: William Ryan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?