XChange Telecom Corp. v. Sprint Spectrum L.P. et al
Plaintiff: |
XChange Telecom Corp. |
Defendant: |
Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel of New York, Inc., Nextel Partners of Upstate New York, Inc. and Sprint Communications Company L.P. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00054 |
Filed: |
January 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Albany Office |
County: |
Albany |
Presiding Judge: |
Christian F. Hummel |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary L. Sharpe |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 15, 2017 |
Filing
133
DECISION & ORDER that pltf XChange Telecom Corp.'s 101 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/15/2017. (see)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
76
DECISION & ORDER that pltf's 69 motion to stay a ruling on the issue of whether "insertion of an intermediate carrier between a cellular company and a terminating or originating local exchange carrier, affects application of the FCC's intra-MTA rule[,]" Dkt. No. 69-1, is DENIED, without prejudice to renew. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/6/2015. (see)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER that Sprint's 42 Motion to Compel is GRANTED as modified in this Order; XChange's 40 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in that Sprint is directed to ultimately answer the first interrogatory but that both parties a re directed to split the cost of the underlying CDR analysis as directed in this Order; Sprint's 42 request for a more definitive damages computation is GRANTED; Parties' request for sanctions are DENIED; Parties have 45 days to comply with this Order. Discovery and motion deadlines, as previously extended on February 2, 2015, shall remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/24/2015. (see)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - ORDERED that defendants' partial motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 8) is GRANTED in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED that counts one, six, and seven of XChange's complaint (Compl. 33-42, 56-62, 63-66) are DISMISSED IN THEIR ENTIRETY and count three (id. 49-51) is DISMISSED IN PART only insofar as it seeks damages for unpaid interstate access charges prior to December 1, 2012; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel to schedule further proceedings in accordance with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/16/2014. (jel, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?