H&R Block Tax Services, LLC v. Judy Strauss
Plaintiff: H&R Block Tax Services, LLC
Defendant: Judy Strauss
Counter_claimant: Judy Strauss
Counter_defendant: H&R Block Tax Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00085
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Schoharie
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E. Kahn
Presiding Judge: Christian F. Hummel
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants counterclaim (Dkt. No. 32) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants first two affirmative defenses (Dkt. No. 33) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants Motion to Amend her Amended Answer (Dkt. No. 92) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on January 27, 2017. (sas)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Settlement Motion (Dkt. No. 64) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on September 20, 2016. (sas)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECISION and ORDERED, that Plaintiff H&R Block Tax Services, LLCs Motion (Dkt. No. 24) for a temporary restraining order seeking to hold Defendant Judy Strauss in contempt of the Courts Memorandum-Decision and Order dated February 4, 2015 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that the covenants against competition and solicitation described in the Courts Memorandum-Decision and Order dated February 4, 2015 be equitably extended to run for one year from the date of this Decision and Order; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiff be awarded $17,200 in compensatory damages; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiff be awarded $15,616.40 in attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 07, 2015. (sas)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDERED, that Plaintiff H&R Block Tax Services, LLCs Motion (Dkt. No. 5) for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is GRANTED. Defendant Judy Strauss and all those acting in active concert or participation with her are hereby ordered to immediately:(1) refrain from directly or indirectly offering tax return preparation and related services in or within forty-five miles of Cobleskill, New York; (2) refrain from solicitation of clients of the former H&R Block office in Cobleskill; and (3) discontinue using, and assign to Plaintiff, the telephone number(s) associated with her former H&R Block business. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on February 04, 2015. (sas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&R Block Tax Services, LLC v. Judy Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&R Block Tax Services, LLC
Represented By: Julia C. Colarusso
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Represented By: Peter J. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Strauss
Represented By: Gregory E. Schaaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Judy Strauss
Represented By: Gregory E. Schaaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: H&R Block Tax Services, LLC
Represented By: Julia C. Colarusso
Represented By: Paul M. Freeman
Represented By: Matthew J. Griesemer
Represented By: Peter J. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?