Schulz v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Schulz
Defendant: United States and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2015cv01299
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Christian F. Hummel
Presiding Judge: Brenda K. Sannes
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6703
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER that the Government's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 243 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Schulzs penalty under 26 U.S.C. § 6700 is properly assessed at $4,430.00, and is DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk is direc ted to enter judgment in favor of the Government on its counterclaim (Dkt. No. 29 ) against Schulz in the amount of $4,430.00, plus statutory interest accruing from March 9, 2015, the date of the assessment. Plaintiff's motion for summar y judgment (Dkt. No. 244 ) is DENIED and the Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 8 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, (Dkt. No. 232 ), is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/27/2019. (Copy served on plaintiff via regular and certified mail)(rjb, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 224 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's letter motions (Dkt. No. 233 , 235 ) seeking permission to file exhibits in support of his motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 197 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/9/2018. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 197 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 7/12/18. (Copy served on plaintiff via regular mail)(rjb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulz v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?