Romak v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Peter Romak
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01380
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL JUDGMENT: in favor of Commissioner of Social Security against Jeffrey Peter Romak. (jmb)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECISION & ORDER: DENYING plaintiff's # 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and GRANTING Defendant's # 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, for the reasons set forth in this decision the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED and the # 1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey Peter Romak is DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/7/2017. (jmb)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter is terminated. This case will be decided directly, without Report and Recommendation, by the Honorable District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/12/2016. (jmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romak v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Peter Romak
Represented By: Peter M. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?