Spiewak et al v. A.O. Smith Water Products et al
Plaintiff: Spiewak, Thomas Spiewak and Ellen Spiewak
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Products, Avocet Enterprises, Inc., Bird Incorporated, CBS Corporation, DAP, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Eaton Aeroquip, Armstrong International, Inc., Ventfabrics Inc., Binghamton Hardware & HVAC Supply Corp., Bird & Son, Inc., Boeing Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Burnham Corporation, Viacom Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Colonial Plumbing and Heating Supply, Inc., Curtiss Wright Flow Control Corporation, La Mirada Products Co., Inc., Duro Dyne Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific Corporation, B.F. Goodrich Company, Goodyear Canada, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (THE), Henderson-Johnson Co. Inc., Allied Signal, Inc., Delaval, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, McDonnell Douglass Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, New Yorker Boiler Company, Inc., Owens Illinois, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Corp., Security Supply Corporation, Syracuse Supply Company, T.J. Bell & Co., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, York International Corporation and Aeroquip Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00040
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Schenectady
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Filing 26 LETTER RESPONSE: to the #7 Notice of Admission Requirement. Attorney Ted Eder requests to be removed as counsel of record for this matter. (jmb)
February 2, 2017 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to York International Corporation served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017. Acknowledgment filed by York International Corporation., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Entry of Appearance, Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Rule 26 Disclosures served on Richard White, Esq. on 2/2/17, filed by York International Corporation. (Riemer, Jason)
February 2, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by York International Corporation Rule 26 Disclosures (Riemer, Jason)
February 2, 2017 Filing 23 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York International Corporation. (Riemer, Jason)
February 2, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Riemer on behalf of York International Corporation (Riemer, Jason)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that this action is remanded to the New York Supreme Court, County of Schenectady. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 1/23/2017. [Copy served upon NY Supreme Court, County of Schenectady via certified mail.] (nmk)
January 20, 2017 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Remand and Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation submitted to Judge Frederick H. Scullin, Jr.. (DiLonardo, Anna)
January 20, 2017 Filing 19 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avocet Enterprises, Inc.. (Chamra, Casey)
January 20, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Chamra on behalf of Avocet Enterprises, Inc. (Chamra, Casey)
January 19, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, Parker Hannifin Corporation; Attorney Anne Marie Kearney, Email address is AnnMarie.Kearney@troutmansanders.com. Phone number is 212-704-6000. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC; Attorney Arthur Bromberg, Email address is adbromber@mdwcg.com. Phone number is 973-618-4100. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, New York Boiler Company; Attorney Elizabeth Young, Email address is Elizabeth.young@wilsonelser.com. Phone number is 212-490-3000. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, Duro Dyne Corporation; Attorney Frank Friestedt, Email address is ffriestedt@mcgivneyandkluger.com. Phone number is 215-557-1900. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant,Eaton Aeroquip; Attorney Gabriel Ferstendig, Email address is gferstendig@mdmc-law.com. Phone number is 212-483-9490. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, IMO Industries; Attorney Joseph Colao and David J. Goodearl, Email address is jcolao@leaderberkon.com; dgoodearl@leaderberkon.com. Phone number is 212-486-2400. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, A.O. Smith Water Products; Attorney Michelle Grady and Laura Hollman, Email address is mgrady@eckertseamans.com; lhollman@eckertseams.com. Phone number is 914-949-2909. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, T.J. Bell & Co.; Attorney Peter Venetis, Email address is pvenetis@lbbslaw.com. Phone number is 212-232-1300. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.; Attorney Shehzad Hasan and Thomas Murphy, Email address is shasan@steptoe.com; tmurphy@steptoe.com. Phone number is 212-506-3900. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, York International Corporation; Attorney Shazia C. deWit and Attorney Monica R. Kostrzewa, Email address is schaudhridewit@hoaglandlongo.com.; mkostrzewa@hoaglandlongo.com Phone number is 732-545-4717. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 19, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant, Curtiss-Wright Flow Control; Attorney Ted Eder, Email address is teder@smsm.com. Phone number is 212-651-7500. Admissions due by 2/2/2017. (khr)
January 18, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Attaching Service List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Service List)(DiLonardo, Anna)
January 18, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Plaintiffs', Attorney Richard White, Phone number is 212-681-1575. Admissions due by 2/1/2017. {Copy sent to Attorney with forms by regular mail} (jmb)
January 13, 2017 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/22/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
January 13, 2017 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (jmb)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT": relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (jmb)
January 13, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court - County of Schenectady, case number 2016-2480 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0206-3899539) filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spiewak et al v. A.O. Smith Water Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avocet Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Casey Chamra
Represented By: Steven A. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Incorporated
Represented By: Carol G. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Gernant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Patrick J. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Masino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Beneventano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventfabrics Inc.
Represented By: Casey Chamra
Represented By: Steven A. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binghamton Hardware & HVAC Supply Corp.
Represented By: William A. Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Carol G. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Represented By: Virginia P. Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Anna M. DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp.
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Judith A. Yavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Plumbing and Heating Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Peter S. Marlette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss Wright Flow Control Corporation
Represented By: Christian H. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Mirada Products Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Gernant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Dyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Joseph P. LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert J. Mullins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Dennis E. Vega
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Christian J. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.F. Goodrich Company
Represented By: Patrick J. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Jo Herrscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (THE)
Represented By: Mary Jo Herrscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson-Johnson Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Masino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Anna M. DiLonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonnell Douglass Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Represented By: Virginia P. Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Yorker Boiler Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Scrudato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Richard O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Corp.
Represented By: Mark S. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Supply Corporation
Represented By: William A. Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse Supply Company
Represented By: David E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. Bell & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Judith A. Yavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Jason Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroquip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spiewak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Spiewak
Represented By: Richard M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Spiewak
Represented By: Richard M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?