AngioDynamics, Inc. v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AngioDynamics, Inc.
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00598
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Christian F. Hummel
Presiding Judge: Brenda K. Sannes
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REDACTED MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER re 201 : It is hereby ORDERED that AngioDynamics' motion to maintain certain portions of its submission under seal (Dkt. No. 194 ) is GRANTED in part to the extent set forth in this opinio n, and AngioDyna mics is directed to file a copy of its letter brief and exhibits (Dkt. No. 195 ) with revised redactions consistent with this opinion no later than June 25, 2021. It is further ORDERED that Bard's motion to maintain certain por tions of its subm ission under seal (Dkt. No. 197 ) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Dr. Frankel may not offer a damages analysis at trial based on Indicators 1 through 6 (as defined in this opinion), but may offer a damages analysis based on his alternative calculation for Indicator 7 (as defined in this opinion) that is derived from AngioDynamics' own sales data. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 6/11/2021. (nmk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REDACTED MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: RE 188 . It is hereby ORDERED that Bard's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 132 ) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Bard's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 133 ) is DENIED in its entirety. It is further ORDERED that AngioDynamics' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 134 ) is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/5/2021. (nmk)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER that the parties' motion to file under seal (Dkt. No. 156 ) and Teleflex's uncontested application to maintain its confidential information under seal (Dkt. No. 155 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice to ren ewal in accordance with this Decision. With respect to the items for which sealing has been denied, the parties may renew their motions to seal no later than March 15, 2021, with supporting affidavits from individuals with personal knowledge setti ng forth the reasons why any proposed redactions meet the sealing standard as articulated in Lugosch. On March 16, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall publicly file those items for which sealing has been denied unless covered by the parties' timely renewed motions to seal. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/1/2021. (rjb, )
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/6/18. (rjb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AngioDynamics, Inc. v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AngioDynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Andrew Gravante
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Adam R. Shaw
Represented By: Jenna C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?