Muhiddin v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Kotcher Muhiddin
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Gwynne DiNolfo, Kirstjen Nielsen, Department of Homeland Security and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv00906
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for L. Francis Cissna answer due 9/5/2018; Department of Homeland Security answer due 9/4/2018; Gwynne DiNolfo answer due 8/29/2018; Kirstjen Nielsen answer due 9/6/2018; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 9/4/2018. (jlb)
August 23, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Affidavit of Service. Replaced Attachment 4 with an affidavit of service with the correct caption. (jlb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavits of Service served on US Attorney, Attorney General, Director of USCIS, Director of DHS, Gwinne DiNolfo on 8/8/18, 8/10/18, 8/14/18, 8/15/18, 8/16/18, filed by Kotcher Muhiddin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney General, #2 Affidavit USCIS Director - Cissna, #3 Affidavit DHS Director - Nielsen, #4 Affidavit DiNolfo)(Manley, Kathy) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/23/2018) (jlb, ).
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney)(jlb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, #2 Summons Issued as to Gwynne Dinolfo, #3 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, #4 Summons Issued as to Kirstjen Nielsen)(jlb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DE NOVO NATURALIZATION HEARING PURSUANT TO 8 U.S.C 1447(b) AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against L. Francis Cissna, Department of Homeland Security, Gwynne DiNolfo, Kirstjen Nielsen, and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-4465614) filed by Kotcher Muhiddin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhiddin v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwynne DiNolfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kotcher Muhiddin
Represented By: Barbara Elisabeth Weiner
Represented By: Kathy E. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?