Chen & Ju Inc. v. Zhang et al

Appellee: Gui Yong Zhang, Xue Hui Zhang and Yue Hua Chen
Appellant: Chen & Ju Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01005
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 2/11/2019 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. Appellant Brief due by 11/21/2018. (ban)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues filed by Chen & Ju Inc. re #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Relief from Stay, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Chamber's Memo Requiring Further Action, #4 Amended Notice of Hearing, #5 Opposition in Response, #6 Amended Notice of Hearing, #7 Motion to Shorten Time, #8 Letter withdrawing Amended Notice of Hearing, #9 Opposition Response to Amended Motion, #10 Opposition Response to Motion to Shorten Time, #11 Supplemental Response to Motion for Relief from Stay, #12 Amended Response to Motion for Relief from Stay, #13 Objection to Claim, #14 Motion to Shorten Time, #15 Transcript, #16 Order granting in part Motion for Relief from Stay, #17 Notice of Appeal, #18 Cover letter re filing notice of appeal, #19 Motion for Sanctions, #20 Motion to Shorten Time, #21 Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time, #22 Response to Motion for Sanctions, #23 Affidavit of Service, #24 Letter, #25 Letter, #26 Order denying Motion for Sanctions, #27 Notice of Appeal, #28 Cover Letter re filing notice of appeal)(usbcns, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Compliance)(usbcns, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:18-cv-1005 MAD and 1:18-cv-1007 MAD: The Court hereby ORDERS that pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Civil Nos. 18-cv-1007 and 18-cv-1005 are hereby consolidated; and the Court further ORDERS that pending a future order dismissing one of these actions, Civil No. 1:18-cv-1005 shall be designated as the Lead Case, and Civil No. 1:18-cv-1007 shall be designated as theMember Case; and the Court further ORDERS that all further docketing shall take place in the Lead Case 1:18-cv-1005-MAD; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order on all parties inaccordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/5/2018. (ban)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Matthew Mann, Esq. for Chen & Ju Inc. requesting consolidation w case 1:18-cv-1007 for purposes of filing a single brief and record submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Mann, Matthew) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ban).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Upon further review of this case, the Court finds that this case is related to the earlier case of Zhang vs. Ichiban Group, LLC, et al. (Case No. 1:17-cv-148), and therefore, in accordance with the Court's related case policy (See General Order 12) and in the interest of judicial economy, the Court sua sponte directs the Clerk to reassign this case to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/28/18. (lmw)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Letter Motion from Matthew Mann, Esq. for Chen & Ju Inc. requesting review and execution of proposed stipulated order or coordination in review/execution thereof submitted to Judge Suddaby Also for Case 1:18-cv-1007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Stipulated Proposed Order)(Mann, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 8/16/18 by Chen & Ju, Inc. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-11150. (usbcns, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen & Ju Inc. v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gui Yong Zhang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Xue Hui Zhang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Yue Hua Chen
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chen & Ju Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?