Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Tops Markets, LLC

Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Defendant: Tops Markets, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01102
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
1 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2018 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 19, 2018 4 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). [A copy of this report with the list of copyright numbers was mailed to the Register of Copyrights on 9/19/2018.] (Attachments: #1 List of Copyright Numbers) (hmr)
September 19, 2018 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/12/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
September 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Tops Markets, LLC. (hmr)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tops Markets, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4507381) filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Tops Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tops Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?