UMH Properties, Inc. et al v. Village of Coxsackie et al

Plaintiff: UMH of Coxsackie, LLC and UMH Properties, Inc.
Defendant: Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees and Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans
Case Number: 1:2018cv01182
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Andrew T Baxter
1 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrea Lowe is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of UMH Properties, Inc. and UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/29/2018. (nmk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees, Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans re #16 Answer to Complaint (Firth, William)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees, Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans.(Firth, William)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrea Lowe Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4546257. filed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed N. Colfax on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Colfax, Reed)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees, Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans re #12 Notice of Appearance (Firth, William)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Firth on behalf of All Defendants (Firth, William)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Reed Colfax is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of UMH Properties, Inc. and UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or he/she will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/17/2018. (nmk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC of Status of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrea Lowe (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Reed Colfax Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4537079. filed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Village of Coxsackie served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Wardenski, Joseph)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Andrea Lowe, Email address is alowe@relmanlaw.com. Phone number is (202) 728-1888. Admissions due by 10/16/2018. [Notice was emailed to Attorney Lowe on 10/2/2018.](hmr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Reed Colfax, Esq., Email address is rcolfax@relmanlaw.com. Phone number is (202) 728-1888. [Notice was emailed to Attorney Colfax on 10/2/2018.] Admissions due by 10/16/2018. (hmr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:30 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/27/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees, Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans, #2 Summons Issued for Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees)(hmr)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Village of Coxsackie, Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees, Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4524368) filed by UMH Properties, Inc., UMH of Coxsackie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMH Properties, Inc. et al v. Village of Coxsackie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Coxsackie
Represented By: William C. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Coxsackie Board of Trustees
Represented By: William C. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Coxsackie Mayor Mark Evans
Represented By: William C. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMH of Coxsackie, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Reed N. Colfax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMH Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Wardenski
Represented By: Reed N. Colfax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?