Gaetano v. Live Nation Entertainment Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Todd Gaetano
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc. and Ticketmaster, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01195
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Request. Attorney Paskowitz will not be added to the docket as counsel for Plaintiff. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/10/2018. (sg)
October 7, 2018 6 Letter Motion from Spencer Sheehan for Todd Gaetano requesting Attorney Paskowitz removal case submitted to Judge Scullin, Jr . (Sheehan, Spencer)
October 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement: Attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein, Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C., 1 Penn Plaza, New York, NY 10119, Email address is joshua@levinepstein.com. Phone number is 212-792-0046. Admissions due by 10/19/2018. (khr) Emailed to attorney on 10/5/2018.
October 5, 2018 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement:Attorney Larry Paskowitz, The Paskowitz Law Firm, P.C., 208 East 51st Street, New York, NY 10022, Email address is lpaskowitz@pasklaw.com. Phone number is 212-685-0969. Admissions due by 10/19/2018. (khr) Emailed to attorney on 10/5/2018
October 5, 2018 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiffs attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks Chambers at 315-234-8618(a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/28/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) Modified on 10/30/2018 (sg, ).
October 5, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Ticketmaster)(khr)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Live Nation Entertainment Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-4528101) filed by Todd Gaetano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaetano v. Live Nation Entertainment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Gaetano
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?