Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: Dormitory Authority of the State of New York and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01427
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Yu on behalf of United States of America (Yu, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Dormitory Authority of the State of New York waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Katz, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan R. Sabourin on behalf of Dormitory Authority of the State of New York (Sabourin, Nathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Larkin on behalf of United States of America (Larkin, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, G.O. 25 Filing Order via Certified Mail Service, served on United States Attorney for the Northern District of New York, and Attorney General of the United States on December 19, 2018, filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Service)(Katz, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the Attorney General)(dpk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dormitory Authority of the State of New York. (dpk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland; Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Financial Services Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company. (dpk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/4/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dormitory Authority of the State of New York and the United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4587449) filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Steven S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dormitory Authority of the State of New York
Represented By: Nathan R. Sabourin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Larkin
Represented By: James Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?