Monts v. O'Rourke et al
Plaintiff: Edward Monts
Defendant: Jeffrey G. McGonegal, Barry C. Honig, Andrew J. Kaplan, John R. O'Rourke, Eric SO, Riot Blockchain, Inc. and Jason Les
Case Number: 1:2018cv01443
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Scott Carlton Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4646147. filed by Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Hansson, Kurt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas A. Zaccaro Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4646090. filed by Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Hansson, Kurt)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING STAY. This matter is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to dismiss filed in the securities class action in the District of New Jersey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/23/2019. (mab)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Granting Stay of Plaintiff's Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Barry C. Honig, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, John R. O'Rourke, Riot Blockchain, Inc. submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (Hansson, Kurt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation filed on January 9, 2019, Dkt. No. #6 , the deadline in which Defendant, Riot Blockchain, Inc., is to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended to January 23, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/11/2019. (mab)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION extending time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by Riot Blockchain, Inc. submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (Hansson, Kurt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Macie Tuell on behalf of Registered Agents, Inc. of Nevada on December 19, 2018, filed by Edward Monts. (Kim, Phillip)
December 28, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Riot Blockchain, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019. (sfp, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (jdp, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/7/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John R. O'Rourke, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Barry C. Honig, Eric So and Riot Blockchain . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jdp, )
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Deadlines corrected to reflect the correct calendar year. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/7/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jdp, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John R. O'Rourke, Jeffrey G. McGonegal, Andrew J. Kaplan, Jason Les, Barry C. Honig, Eric So, and Riot Blockchain (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4591188) filed by Edward Monts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monts v. O'Rourke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey G. McGonegal
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry C. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Kaplan
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. O'Rourke
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric SO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riot Blockchain, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Les
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Monts
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?