DiBello v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.

Plaintiff: Amy DiBello
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01457
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of E-File)(Barbour, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amy DiBello. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Wietzke, Marc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney C. Perrin Rome, Email address is prome@romearata.com. Phone number is 504-522-9980. Admissions due by 1/3/2019. (Served via regular mail)(jdp, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney W. Chad Stelly, Email address wcstelly@romearata.com. Phone number is 504-522-9980. Admissions due by 1/3/2019. (Served via regular mail) (jdp, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corp.. (dpk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4594642) filed by Amy DiBello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiBello v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy DiBello
Represented By: W. Chad Stelly
Represented By: C. Perrin Rome
Represented By: Marc T. Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: Scott A. Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?