Gizzi v. Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marco Gizzi and Dina Gizzi
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc., Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc., Sonitrol Services of New York, Inc., Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. and Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01465
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/12/2019. The deadline for the parties to select a Mediator is 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/28/2019. (mab)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 10 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 2/22/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Motions to be filed by 1/31/2020. Status Report due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/28/2019. (mab)
January 23, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2019. Appearances: Jeffrey Anderson, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Erin Mead, Esq. for Defendants. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 10:05AM-10:21AM). (mab)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #15 Letter Request seeking to reschedule the Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter. The Rule 16 Initial Conference is RESCHEDULED for January 23, 2019 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before January 16, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/4/2019. (mab)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Request by Dina Gizzi to reschedule the Initial Conference in this matter. (Anderson, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/4/2019 to reflect that this is a letter request and not a status report. (mab).
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur H. Thorn on behalf of All Defendants (Thorn, Arthur)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin P. Mead on behalf of All Defendants (Mead, Erin)
December 21, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #12 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement: Clerk added "adding SecurityCo Solutions, Inc. as corporate parent to both Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc. and Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. and adding Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. as Other Affiliate to Stanley Security Solutions, Inc." to this docket entry (hmr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.; adding SecurityCo Solutions, Inc. as corporate parent to both Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc. and Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. and adding Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. as Other Affiliate to Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of electronic service of 7.1 Statement of Corporate Disclosure)(Mead, Erin) Modified on 12/21/2018 (hmr).
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, upon Albany County Clerk (Mead, Erin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice of removal served on Anderson, Moschetti & Taffany on December 18, 2018, filed by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.. (Mead, Erin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Black & Decker (U.S.) including all cross-claims by Dina Gizzi, Marco Gizzi. (khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE: as to Sonitrol Services of New York, Inc. and Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc., including all cross-claims, without prejudice. (khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Cross-claim. Defendant Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Claims of Defendants, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc. and Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. filed by Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc.(khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Sonitrol Services of New York, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc., Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. by Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc.(khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc., Sonitrol Services of New York, Inc. by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Security Solutions, Inc.(khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc., Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. (khr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 03697-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4595006) filed by Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc., Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gizzi v. Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Erin P. Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonitrol Security Systems of Buffalo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erin P. Mead
Represented By: Arthur H. Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonitrol Services of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha L. Southall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Security Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erin P. Mead
Represented By: Arthur H. Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Erin P. Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Gizzi
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Gizzi
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?