Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01485
Filed: December 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). (Served Register of Copyrights by regular mail). (sal )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving Notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of John Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 2/13/2019. (sal )
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 1/8/2019. (sal )
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (James, Jacqueline)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Letter Request for permission to file a motion seeking leave to file a third party subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourn any scheduled Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference until the defendant is named and served. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 1/7/2019. (sal)
January 6, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Adjourn Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference submitted to Judge Peebles . (James, Jacqueline)
December 26, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED.R.IV.P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (khr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s)[A copy of this report was mailed to the Register of Copyrights via regular mail on 12/26/2018. (khr)
December 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement with Jury Demand against John Doe (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4599842) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?