Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01495
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 6 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Motions to be filed by 2/28/2020. Status Report due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/4/2019. (tab)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court held a Rule 16 Initial Conference with the parties on 2/1/2019. The Court, sua sponte, exempts this matter from the Mandatory Mediation Program. SO ORDERED. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/4/2019. (tab)
February 1, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/1/2019. Appearances by Frederic P. Gallin, Esq. for Plaintiff (by telephone); Kyle N. Kordich, Esq. for Defendant (in person). This case is opted out of Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab)
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company. (Gallin, Fredric)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change in Conference Date: At the request of counsel and on consent of parties, the Initial Conference has been reset for Friday, 2/1/2019 @ 11:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Counsel are permitted to appear for this conference in person or by telephone. If telephonic participation is preferred, parties may dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719 # and security code 1234 # to join the call.(tab)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Jury Demand, #6 Answer to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation. (Kordich, Kyle)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Whirlpool Corporation. (Kordich, Kyle)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whirlpool Corporation. (Kordich, Kyle)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation.(Kordich, Kyle)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation.(Kordich, Kyle)
December 28, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Whirlpool Corporation answer due 1/2/2019. (khr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/28/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Whirlpool Corporation (khr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (khr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 907230-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4602200) filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Kyle N. Kordich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Fredric P. Gallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?