UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Moyer
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Respondent: Frank J. Moyer
Case Number: 1:2018mc00018
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7604
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Unexecuted as to USA on 7/26/2018 as to the Court Order. (meb)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER REQUEST & ORDER re Letter Motion #4 from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing be rescheduled for September 20, 2018. Request is GRANTED. Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Motion Hearing is reset for 9/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 31, 2018. (sas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Letter Motion from AUSA Thomas Spina, Jr. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting that the Motion to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 1, 2018, be rescheduled for September 20, 2018 submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Spina, Thomas)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That the above-named respondent appear before the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, at the James T. Foley U.S. Courthouse, 445 Broadway, Albany, New York on 8/1/2018 at 9:30 a.m. to show cause why the respondent should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service Summonses served upon the respondent on October 6, 2017, by Revenue Officer Alan Tabakman. That a copy of this Order, together with the petition, exhibits, and other attachments, be served upon the respondent by the United States Marshal, or in the alternative, by the District Director of the Internal revenue Service or his authorized employee, on or before 7/24/2018. That the respondent shall file and serve any responsive papers on or before 7/30/2018. That any and all subsequent pleadings or papers filed herein by petitioner (not including any arrest order) may be served upon the respondent/taxpayer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 7/20/2018. (jel, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(khr)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas Spina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank J. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?