Ballard v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Kenneth Ballard
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Baaki, William)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED for March 7, 2019 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before February 28, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/13/2019. (mab)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Baaki, William)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Baaki on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Baaki, William)
January 24, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC answer due 2/4/2019. (dpk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND CIVIL COVER SHEET served on LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC on 01/11/2019, filed by Kenneth Ballard. (Harwick, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (dpk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (dpk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/1/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4609776) filed by Kenneth Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ballard
Represented By: David I. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: William H. Baaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?