Diederich, Jr. v. Letitia James, et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Doe, Janna Doe and Mike Diederich, Jr.
Defendant: Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District, Bill deBlasio, Superintendent of Schools of the East Rampo Central School District, Thomas P. DiNapoli, Letitia James, MaryEllen Elia, Betty Rosa and Superintendent of Schools of the East Ramapo Central School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv00035
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request from David S. Thayer for Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Bill deBlasio and on behalf of all defendants, requesting an extension of the time by which Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education answer due 3/22/2019; Thomas P. DiNapoli answer due 3/22/2019; MaryEllen Elia answer due 3/22/2019; Letitia James answer due 3/22/2019; Betty Rosa answer due 3/22/2019; Superintendent of Schools of the East Ramapo Central School District answer due 3/22/2019; Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District answer due 3/22/2019; Bill deBlasio answer due 3/22/2019. The Initial Conference currently scheduled for 2/12/2019 @ 9:30 am in Albany, and the deadline to file a civil case management plan is adjourned at this time. The initial conference and initial disclosure exchange will be reset at the appropriate time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/14/2019. (tab)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Letter Motion from David S. Thayer for Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Bill deBlasio requesting an extension of the time by which Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Sannes . (Thayer, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Sumner Thayer on behalf of Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Bill deBlasio (Thayer, David)
January 10, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education answer due 1/16/2019; Thomas P. DiNapoli answer due 1/16/2019; MaryEllen Elia answer due 1/16/2019; Letitia James answer due 1/16/2019; Betty Rosa answer due 1/16/2019; Superintendent of Schools of the East Rampo Central School District answer due 1/16/2019; Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District answer due 1/16/2019; Bill deBlasio answer due 1/16/2019. (khr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/12/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Thomas P. DiNapoli, MaryEllen Elia, Letitia James, Betty Rosa, Superintendent of Schools of the East Rampo Central School District, Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District, Bill deBlasio. (khr)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 903772-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4613551) filed by Superintendent of Schools of the East Rampo Central School District, Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District, Betty Rosa, Thomas P. DiNapoli, Letitia James, MaryEllen Elia, Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education, Bill deBlasio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 List of Documents Submitted in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diederich, Jr. v. Letitia James, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor of the NYC Department of Education
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Represented By: David Sumner Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent of the Kiryas Joel Village School District
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill deBlasio
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Represented By: David Sumner Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent of Schools of the East Rampo Central School District
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. DiNapoli
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryEllen Elia
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Rosa
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent of Schools of the East Ramapo Central School District
Represented By: Ryan L. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Doe
Represented By: Michael D. Diederich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janna Doe
Represented By: Michael D. Diederich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Diederich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?