Khan v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Asif Khan
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Christian F Hummel
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #6 Stipulation to remand to New York State Supreme Court, Ulster County, for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/8/19. (lmw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC submitted to Judge Hummel. (Baaki, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT to Judge Hummel by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Baaki, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Baaki, William)
January 11, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC answer due 1/18/2019. (jdp, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/6/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT (jdp, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ulster County Supreme Court, case number 18-4238 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4613718) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asif Khan
Represented By: John G. Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: William H. Baaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?