Pinkowski v. Harbour et al
Plaintiff: Alissa Pinkowski
Defendant: Scott W. Harbour and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Undetermined: Terence P. O'Connor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00121
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that TERENCE P. O'CONNOR has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Robert Becher, Esq. and Joel B. Schechter, Esq.. Dated: 3/14/2019(Emery, Ashley)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/28/2019. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 4/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/13/2019. (mab)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 6 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is June/28/2019. Discovery due by 1/30/2020. Motions to be filed by 3/31/2020. Status Report due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/13/2019. (mab)
March 12, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2019. Appearances: Robert Becher, Esq. for Plaintiff; Ashley Emery, Esq. for Defendants. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Counsel have selected a Mediator. Stipulation selecting such Mediator to be filed on the case docket. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:57AM-10:05AM). (mab)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED for March 12, 2019 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/26/2019. (mab)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley M Emery on behalf of Scott W. Harbour, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Emery, Ashley)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is scheduled for March 1, 2019 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/13/2019. (mab)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Scott W. Harbour, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Schechter, Joel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Scott W. Harbour, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Schechter, Joel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott W. Harbour, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Schechter, Joel)
January 31, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY : the #3 General Order 25 was replaced with corrected General Order 25 because the wrong document was attached. Emailed copy to Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendant's Attorney's. (jdp, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/31/2019) (jdp, ).
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT. (jdp, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schenectady County Supreme Court, case number 2018-2893 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4633080) filed by Scott W. Harbour, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinkowski v. Harbour et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott W. Harbour
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Represented By: Ashley M Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Represented By: Ashley M Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Pinkowski
Represented By: Robert A. Becher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Terence P. O'Connor
Represented By: Terence P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?