Julian v. Applied Robotics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Julian
Defendant: Applied Robotics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Applied Robotics, Inc..(Diddel, Heather)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Callahan on behalf of Applied Robotics, Inc. (Callahan, Erin)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request for defendant Applied Robotics, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before 4/12/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 3/26/2019. (sal )
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Rosborough, IV on behalf of Applied Robotics, Inc. (Rosborough, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Heather D. Diddel, Esq. for Applied Robotics, Inc. requesting the Court's approval of the parties' agreement to extend until April 12, 2019 Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Brian Julian's Complaint. submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. . (Diddel, Heather)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Diddel on behalf of Applied Robotics, Inc. (Diddel, Heather)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/14/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Applied Robotics, Inc. (hmr)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Applied Robotics, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4654141) filed by Brian Julian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian v. Applied Robotics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Julian
Represented By: Shelly A. Leonard
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Robotics, Inc.
Represented By: Heather D. Diddel
Represented By: Erin M. Callahan
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?