Laspisa v. Citifinancial Company et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Laspisa
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Carrington Morgage Services, Citifinancial Company and Carrington Mortgage Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00228
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Request for Injunction served on Citifinancial Company, filed by John Michael Laspisa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service for Carrington Mortgage Services, #2 Mailing Envelope)(meb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PENDING LEGAL ACTION filed by John Michael Laspisa. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
February 20, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (Served on plaintiff via regular mail) (meb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (meb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Michael Laspisa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to CitiFinancial Company, #2 Proposed Summons as to Carrington Mortgage Services) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (meb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrington Morgage Services, Citifinancial Company filed by John Michael Laspisa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laspisa v. Citifinancial Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Morgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Laspisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?