C.L. King & Associates, Inc. v. Nicklin
Plaintiff: C.L. King & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: William T. Nicklin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00248
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation filed on February 27, 2019, Dkt. No. #5 , the Rule 16 Initial Conference and the deadline for the parties to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures in this matter are ADJOURNED for sixty (60) days. Counsel are directed to file a Status Report by May 1, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/1/2019. (mab)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Adjourn Deadlines by C.L. King & Associates, Inc. submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (Wolfe, Owen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William T. Nicklin re #1 Notice of Removal, (Schuh, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/18/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by William T. Nicklin. (Attachments: #1 State Court Answer)(meb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 907555-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4655852) filed by William T. Nicklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.L. King & Associates, Inc. v. Nicklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L. King & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Nicklin
Represented By: Mark L. Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?