Persico v. Cassadei et al
Plaintiff: George P. Persico
Defendant: Cassadei & Neri, Michael F. Cassadei and Annmarie Neri
Case Number: 1:2019cv00541
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Filed by George P. Persico, pro se. {Exhibits attached}. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rep)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER denying #15 ; denying #17 Motions. On June 12, 2019, plaintiff pro se George P. Prosico filed a Petition for the appointment of a guardian ad litem. Dkt. No. 15. On June 17, 2019, plaintiff filed an amended petition for the appointment of a guardian ad litem. Dkt. No. 17. These requests appear to seek the Courts appointment of a federal prosecutor from the United States Attorneys Office to investigate, and potentially to prosecute, apparently criminal activities of the defendants. See Dkt. Nos. 15, 17. Plaintiffs request is DENIED. Plaintiff is advised that the Court cannot order the criminal investigation and/or prosecution of individuals. The law is clear that there is no private right of action to enforce either state or federal criminal statutes. Delany v. City of Albany, No. 1:18-CV-1259 (LEK/ATB), 2018 WL 5923901, at *5 (N.D.N.Y. Nov. 13, 2018), report and recommendation adopted in part, rejected in part on other grounds sub nom. Delaney v. City of Albany, 2019 WL 125769 (N.D.N.Y. Jan. 7, 2019) (citing Carvel v. Ross, No. 09-Civ. 722, 2011 WL 856283, at *11-12 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 6, 2011)). The decision whether to investigate or prosecute is left to the discretion of the prosecutors office and/or law enforcement agencies, not the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide plaintiff pro se copies of the cases cited herein. SO ORDERED. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/21/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on 6/14/2019 with copies of the cited cases provided.)(tab)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED PETITION for review/to Appoint guardian ad litem ad Litem, filed by George P. Persico. Filing also contains a response to the #8 Answer and a copy of a petition to Gov. Andrew Cuomo. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (rep)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by George P. Persico. (khr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 PETITION for appointment of a guardian ad litem office of the U.S. Attorney General filed by George P. Persico. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Envelope) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (khr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Answer to Complaint, #13 Redacted Document, #10 Redacted Document, #12 Redacted Document, #9 Redacted Document, #11 Redacted Document Affidavit of Mailing by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri. (Basile, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri regarding Hudson Mohawk Group, Inc. (Galway Co-Op.Com, Inc.) (Basile, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify/correct the docket text. (jmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri, regarding Hudson Mohawk Group, Inc. (Real Estate Services of N.E., Inc.) (Basile, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify/correct the docket text. (jmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri, regarding Hudson Mohawk Group, Inc. (Real Estate Services of New York, Inc.) (Basile, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify/correct the docket text. (jmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri, regarding Hudson Mohawk Group, Inc. (Basile, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify/correct the docket text. (jmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri, regarding Hudson Mohawk Group, Inc. (Galway Co-Op LLC) (Basile, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify/correct the docket text. (jmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, Annmarie Neri.(Basile, Michael)
June 6, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Annmarie Neri: answer due 6/13/2019. (rep)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: For Summons and Complaint served on Annmarie Neri on 5/23/2019. Filed by George P. Persico, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rep)
June 3, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Michael F. Cassadei - answer due 6/11/2019; Cassadei & Neri - answer due 6/11/2019. (rep)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: for Summons and Complaint served on Michael Cassadei and Cassadei & Neri on May 21, 2019. Filed by George P. Persico, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Michael Cassadei, #2 Cover letter and mailing envelope) {Pursuant to the Plaintiff's cover letter, a copy of the docket sheet has been sent to him via regular mail}.(rep)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE returned executed by George P. Persico. (khr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and mailed to the pro se plaintiff, along with the Local Rules, Pro Se Handbook, a file stamped copy of the Complaint, summonses for service, and an extra, signed copy of the Notice for the plaintiff to keep for his records. (rep)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/31/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep) Modified on 5/13/2019 - the clerk notes that a copy of this document was mailed to the Pro Se Plaintiff (rep).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, and Annmarie Neri. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Michael F. Cassadei, #2 Summons Issued as to Cassadei and Neri)(rep)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Michael F. Cassadei, Cassadei & Neri, and Annmarie Neri (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB011371) filed by George P. Persico, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-16, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persico v. Cassadei et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassadei & Neri
Represented By: Michael E. Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Cassadei
Represented By: Michael E. Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annmarie Neri
Represented By: Michael E. Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George P. Persico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?