Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Not Yet Classified: James E. Hacker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00586
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that James E. Hacker has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Dennis First and Angelo Capalbo. Dated: June 26, 2019(First, Dennis)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPROVED PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/20/2019. (tab)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (First, Dennis)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 7/17/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4 days (jury trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Motions to be filed by 9/17/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/27/2019. Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab)
June 18, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019. Appearances by Angelo Capalbo, Esq. for plaintiff (by telephone) and Brian Krzykowski, Esq. for Defendants. Pretrial deadlines are established. A Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Krzykowski on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (Krzykowski, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (First, Dennis)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. First on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC (First, Dennis)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Marinello, Hilda)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Marinello, Hilda)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT. (jdp, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Supreme Court, case number EF2019-66703 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4743539) filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Angelo Capalbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Hilda R Marinello
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James E. Hacker
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?