Constantine v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bobbi Constantine and Bobbi A Constantine
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Richard Pereira and Jeff Turner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00702
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER re #30 Letter Motion from constantine for Bobbi A Constantine requesting jury demand submitted to Judge Hummel filed by Bobbi A Constantine. Defendant is directed to file a response to Plaintiff's request, Dkt. No. 30 within 10 days of this Order, indicating agreement to or objection of, plaintiff requesting a jury demand. [Response due on 8/19/2019]. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/7/2019. (tab)
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 Letter Motion from constantine for Bobbi A Constantine requesting jury demand submitted to Judge Hummel . (Constantine, Bobbi)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Application to waive PACER fees. It is hereby Ordered that plaintiff, Bobbi Constantine's, request to have PACER fees waived, to include fees currently owed is GRANTED. This Order effectively begins as of January 1, 2019 and will continue until the disposition of this civil action or, alternatively, until further Order of the Court. So Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/1/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on 8/1/2019 on Plaintiff. PACER notified and Text Order submitted.)(tab)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in support of Plaintiff's request to have PACER fees waiver, Dkt. No. 22, filed by Bobbi A Constantine. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (tab)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4-5 days (non-jury). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2019. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Motions to be filed by 4/16/2020. Status Report due by 11/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/29/2019. (Copy served via regular mail to plaintiff on 7/29/2019)(tab)
July 29, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/29/2019. Appearances by Bobbi Constantine, pro se plaintiff; Meg R. Reid, Esq. for Defendants. ALS Interpreter: Marian Eaton, sworn and present. The pretrial deadlines are established and set. A scheduling Order will be issued in this case. The issue of jury vs. non-jury trial is brought up as plaintiff believed she had a jury demand in place. The Court advises plaintiff that the case is deemed non-jury and that her time to demand a jury has expired. Plaintiff is directed to confer with Defense counsel and if no agreement as to a jury demand is met, plaintiff is to notify the Court in writing. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson) (tab)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT NOTICE from the chambers of US District Judge, Lawrence E. Kahn: As a reminder, all motions are considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. No oral arguments will be entertained. ***A copy of this Notice was served upon pro se party via US Mail. (sas)
July 23, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #25 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Clerk replaced the document with a flattened version, so that no changes can be made to the document. (hmr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bobbi A Constantine. (Constantine, Bobbi) (Main Document 25 replaced on 7/23/2019) (hmr, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Richard Pereira, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Jeff Turner. (Reid, Meg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER denying #22 Letter Request/Motion from Bobbi Constantine, requesting waiver of the fee for PACER account. As Plaintiff has been granted a request for e-filing credentials, filings in this case will be accessible to plaintiff, for downloading and printing, free of PACER charges, one time per filing. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/19/2019. (tab)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 Letter Motion from Bobbi Constantine, requesting waiver of the fee for PACER account. (see)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard Pereira, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Jeff Turner. (Reid, Meg)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER denying #18 Letter Request for the Court to deny Defendant's request to reset the Initial Conference as moot, as the Court has already rescheduled the Initial Conference. The Initial Conference is set for Monday, July 29th, 2019 @ 10:00 AM. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/8/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(tab)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #6 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/8/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(tab)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Letter Motion re initial conference filed by Bobbi Constantine submitted to Judge Hummel. (sfp, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bobbi Constantine. (sfp, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff Reply to the Defendant's Answer filed by Bobbi Constantine. (sfp, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Bobbi Constantine requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Hummel. (sfp, )
June 24, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued. Replaced the GO#25 with Pro se Handbook and Notice. The GO #25 was filed twice. (khr)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Letter Request from Meg Reid, Esq. for Richard Pereira, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Jeff Turner requesting Continuance of Initial Conference. The Initial Conference has been reset for 7/29/2019 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/24/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/21/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on 6/21/2019)(tab)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER deferring ruling on #6 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically pending Plaintiff's submission of the Pro Se Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password. Upon receipt of the completed application, the issuance of e-filing credentials will be considered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/21/2019. (Copy served via regular mail, and copy of the required application for submission included in the mailing on 6/21/2019)(tab)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying #5 Letter Request from Bobbi Constantine requesting that this case be remanded back to Supreme Court, as the matter was properly removed. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/21/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on 6/21/2019)(tab)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. filed by Richard Pereira, Jeff Turner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit of Meg Reid) (Reid, Meg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Reid, Meg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.. (Reid, Meg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Meg Reid, Esq. for Richard Pereira, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Jeff Turner requesting Continuance submitted to Judge Hummel . (Reid, Meg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bobbi Constantine. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(hmr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Bobbi Constantine requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to U.S. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (hmr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Bobbi Constantine requesting that this case be remanded back to Supreme Court submitted to U.S. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (hmr)
June 13, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Richard Pereira answer due 6/20/2019; Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company answer due 6/20/2019; Jeff Turner answer due 6/20/2019. (hmr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE, together with pro se packet was mailed to Bobbi Constantine via regular mail on 6/13/2019. (hmr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2019) (khr, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/12/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [Copy of the G.O. 25 Filing Order Issued was mailed to pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 6/13/2019.](hmr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Richard Pereira, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Jeff Turner. (hmr)
June 13, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk added filed by "Travelers Home and Marine Insurance, Jeff Turner and Richard Pereira" and removed "Bobbi Constantine" since that was added in error. (hmr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga County Supreme Court, case number 20191561 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4768849) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance, Jeff Turner and Richard Pereira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) Modified on 6/13/2019 (hmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantine v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi A Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pereira
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Turner
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?