Hospitality International, Inc. et al v. Alfa Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hospitality International, Inc. and Red Carpet Inns International, Inc.
Defendant: Alfa Hospitality, LLC and Lirzet Cecunjanin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00705
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to re #7 Request for Entry of Default. (khr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alfa Hospitality, LLC by Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation)(Azzinari, Glenn)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: On July 12, 2019, Plaintiffs filed Proof of Service of the Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Alfa Hospitality, LLC in this matter. Dkt. No. #5 . The time for this Defendant to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint has expired. To date, Plaintiff has not filed a request for a Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Alfa Hospitality, LLC pursuant to Local Rule 55.2. As to Defendant Lirzet Cecunjanin, it does not appear that proof of service of the Summons and Complaint was filed on the case docket. Plaintiffs are directed to advise as to the status of the Defendants in this action by August 13, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/6/2019. (mab)
July 15, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Alfa Hospitality, LLC answer due 7/16/2019. (khr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Alfa Hospitality, LLC on June 25, 2019, filed by Red Carpet Inns International, Inc.. (Azzinari, Glenn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 862,886 and 938,212. AO 120 mailed to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on 6/18/2019. (dpk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alfa Hospitality, LLC and Lirzet Cecunjanin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Lirzet Cecunjanin) (dpk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alfa Hospitality, LLC and Lirzet Cecunjanin (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4770038) filed by Hospitality International, Inc. and Red Carpet Inns International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospitality International, Inc. et al v. Alfa Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospitality International, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Azzinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Carpet Inns International, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Azzinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lirzet Cecunjanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?