Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Post Oak Publishing, Tokeco Tunes, No Surrender Music, Peermusic III LTD., House of Cash, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. and Grant R. Guttenberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv00767
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). {Mailed to Register of Copyrights on 9/12/2019 by regular mail} (see)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/11/2019. (jel, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER BRIEF Letter to Judge Re Settlement Reached by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., No Surrender Music. (Williams, Ted)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation filed on August 1, 2019, this Court granted Defendants an extension of time to August 19, 2019 to respond to the Complaint in this matter. Dkt. No. 9 . The deadline has expired and there has been to appearance by Defendants in this action. Plaintiffs are directed to advise as to the status of this matter by September 6, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/29/2019. (mab)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the Stipulation filed on August 1, 2019, Dkt. No. #8 , the deadline in which Defendants are to respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended to August 16, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/5/2019. (mab)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Ronald R. Schur for Defendant by Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc.. (Schur, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Grant R. Guttenberg answer due 8/2/2019; Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. answer due 8/2/2019. (dpk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and related documents served on Grant R. Guttenberg on July 11, 2019, filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., No Surrender Music, Peermusic III LTD., Post Oak Publishing, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Williams, Ted)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and related documents served on Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. on July 11, 2019, filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., No Surrender Music, Peermusic III LTD., Post Oak Publishing, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Williams, Ted)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Grant R. Guttenberg and Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Guttenberg Restaurants) (dpk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/23/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) (Mailed to Register of Copyrights on 7/1/2019) (dpk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., No Surrender Music, Peermusic III LTD., Post Oak Publishing, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Eighth Note, Inc. for Concord Music Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent Elektra/Asylum/Nonesuch Records, a Division of Warner Communications for Eleksylum Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Gannett Co., Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (dpk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grant R. Guttenberg and Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4783379) filed by Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Post Oak Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Peermusic III LTD., Broadcast Music, Inc., No Surrender Music, Tokeco Tunes, Eleksylum Music, Inc. and Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Schedule), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post Oak Publishing
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peermusic III LTD.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guttenberg Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant R. Guttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?