The City of Saratoga Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Saratoga Springs
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd., Express Scripts Holding Company, Prime Therapeutics LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Bellco Drug Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, PSS World Medical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, John N. Kapoor, Express Scripts, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, David A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Anda Inc., Optum, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Walgreen, Co., Mortimer Sackler Family, Noramco, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Purdue Pharma Inc., The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., American Medical Distributors, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, Henry Schein, Inc., HBC Service Company, Allergan PLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Darby Group Companies, Inc., Value Drug Company, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., OptumRx Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGx LLC, Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Sandoz, Inc., Discount Drug Mart, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc., Jonathan D. Sackler, Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00789
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 70 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation. (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 69 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 68 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 67 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caremark Rx, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark Rx, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 66 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caremark L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 TEXT NOTICE as to Defendants' #65 MOTION for a Stay. Plaintiff to file a response to the motion by 9/6/2019. Pursuant to N.Y.N.D.L.R. 7.1 (b)(2), a Reply is not permitted without permission of the Court. The motion is returnable before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart and is on SUBMIT only. No personal appearances are required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (mab)
August 29, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for a Stay of this case filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Adriana Riviere-Badell, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment). Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (mab)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER: On August 7, 2019, Defendants filed a Letter Request seeking a conference to address their intent to file a Motion for a Stay in this matter. Dkt. No. #40 . On August 27, 2019, Defendants filed a Letter Request seeking permission to file a Motion for a Stay and attached a proposed motion for the Court's consideration. Dkt. No. #60 . Defendants' request to file their attached Motion for a Stay is GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to file such motion on the case docket. Defendants' previous request seeking a conference is DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/29/2019. (mab)
August 28, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Hudson on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (Hudson, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER granting #55 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian D. Boone is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendants Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/28/2019. (mab)
August 27, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adriana Riviere-Badell, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 60 Letter Motion for Express Scripts, Inc. requesting permission to file a motion to temporarily stay all proceedings submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Motion to Stay All Proceedings, #2 Memorandum in Support of Proposed Motion to Stay, #3 Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Proposed Motion to Stay, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Swette, Alexandria)
August 27, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Remand to State Court (i.e., Memorandum-w/attached Certificate of Service) filed by Value Drug Company. (Lane, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian W. Park on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Park, Julian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Montas on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Montas, Alana)
August 23, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Riviere-Badell on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
August 22, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian D. Boone Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4847745. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition of Brian D. Boone, #4 Certificates of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Penaro, Steven)
August 22, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #54 Stipulation, Clerk received a call from Attorney Naunton's Office stating that they had inadvertently added Cardinal Health, Inc. as a filer. The Clerk has corrected the entry. (pjh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark L.L.C., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Naunton, Shawn) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove Cardinal Health, Inc. as a filer (pjh).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Defendant Value Drug Company to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter and to conduct the 26(f) planning conference is extended until sixty (60) days following: 1) A final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or 2) This Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/21/2019. (mab)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #44 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Timothy E. Hudson is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendants Navitus Holdings, LLC and Navitus Health Solutions, LLC. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/21/2019. (mab)
August 21, 2019 Filing 51 Letter Motion from Thomas S. Lane for Value Drug Company requesting requesting that the Court grant this application on consent and enter an order extending the time for Value Drug Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference until 60 days following: (1) a final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or (2) this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, whichever is later submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Ex A)(Lane, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 50 Supplemental Admission documents re: #47 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Penaro, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Lane on behalf of Value Drug Company (Lane, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 48 Supplemental Admission documents re: #46 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Penaro, Steven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline R. Strumph Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4844211. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition of Caroline R. Strumph, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Penaro, Steven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kim K. Chemerinsky Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4844170. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition of Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Penaro, Steven)
August 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey E. Walker on behalf of John N. Kapoor (Walker, Kacey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy E. Hudson Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4838138. filed by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Sponsor Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Registration, #4 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Davis, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 43 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Navitus Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Dean Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent FPP, Inc., Corporate Parent SSM Health Care Corporation for Navitus Health Solutions, LLC; Corporate Parent Dean Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent FPP, Inc., Corporate Parent SSM Health Care Corporation for Navitus Holdings, LLC.. (Davis, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE TO LETTER BRIEF filed by Prime Therapeutics LLC as to #10 Notice of Admission Requirement, . (Farrar, Jillian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian K. Farrar on behalf of Prime Therapeutics LLC (Farrar, Jillian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 40 Letter Motion from Defendant Express Scripts, Inc. and Plaintiff City of Saratoga Springs for Express Scripts, Inc. requesting Conference concerning a non-dispositive motion under Local Rule 7.1(b)(2) submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Swette, Alexandria)
August 6, 2019 Filing 39 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp... (Asfendis, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Asfendis on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp. (Asfendis, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G Kobre on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Kobre, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Wicks, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Wicks on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (Wicks, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 34 LETTER BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Remand by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Swette, Alexandria)
August 2, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference set for August 20, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date at this time. (mab)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark L.L.C., CaremarksPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc., to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter and to conduct the 26(f) planning conference is extended until thirty (30) days following: 1) A final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or 2)This Court's ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/1/2019. (mab)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 Letter Motion for The City of Saratoga Springs requesting Expedited Hearing on its Motion to Remand submitted to Judge David N. Hurd . (Shkolnik, Hunter)
July 31, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 10:00 AM in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 8/27/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. filed by The City of Saratoga Springs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) 2017 NY Transfer Order) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 Consent Letter Motion from Shawn P. Naunton for CVS Health Corporation, Caremark L.L.C., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference submitted to Judge David N. Hurd on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.X., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center; Walmart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference))(Naunton, Shawn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. The time for Defendants Cardinal Health Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp., McKesson Corporation and PSS World Medical, Inc., to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter and to conduct the 26(f) planning conference is extended until sixty (60) days following: 1) The Court's ruling on any motions to remand or 2) A final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL, whichever is later Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/29/2019. (mab, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 Consent Letter Motion from James M. Wicks for Cardinal Health Inc. requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference, submitted to Judge David N. Hurd . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference)(Wicks, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S Davis on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (Davis, Nicholas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Patrick Naunton on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark L.L.C., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. (Naunton, Shawn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER OF RESPONSE to Notice of Admission requirements by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC re #12 Notice of Admission Requirement for Nicholas S. Davis, #9 Notice of Admission Requirement for Timothy E. Hudson; Janelle L. Davis and Mackenzie Salenger. (mgh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #14 Notice of Admission Requirement, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, #7 Notice of Admission Requirement, of Counsel of Record (Swette, Alexandria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Menchel on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Menchel, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Swette on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Swette, Alexandria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 Letter dated July 11, 2019 from Caroline Rawls Strumph, Esq., advising the court that the following counsel William H. Jordan, Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, Brian D. Boone and herself intend to seek admission to this Court pro hac vice shortly. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jel, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Penaro on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Penaro, Steven)
July 3, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for CVS Health Corporation answer due 7/8/2019; Caremark L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; Caremark Rx, L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; Express Scripts Holding Company answer due 7/8/2019; Express Scripts, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019; Navitus Health Solutions, LLC answer due 7/8/2019; Navitus Holdings, LLC answer due 7/8/2019; Optum, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019; OptumRx Inc. answer due 7/8/2019; Prime Therapeutics LLC answer due 7/8/2019; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer due 7/8/2019. (mgh)
July 3, 2019 ***Answer deadline updated: answer due Express Scripts, Inc, 7/8/2019; Express Scripts Holding Company answer due 7/8/2019; CVS Health Corporation answer due 7/8/2019; Caremark Rx, L.L.C answer due 7/8/2019; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; Caremark, L.L.C. answer due 7/8/2019; CaremarkPCS, L.L.C answer due 7/8/2019; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer due 7/8/2019; Optum, Inc., answer due 7/8/2019; OptumRx Inc., answer due 7/8/2019; Prime Therapeutics LLC answer due 7/8/2019; Navitus Holdings, LLC answer due 7/8/2019; and Navitus Health Solutions, LLC answer due 7/8/2019. (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts, Inc... (Menchel, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company.. (Menchel, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Menchel, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party The City of Saratoga Springs; Attorney Salvatore C. Badala; Joseph L. Ciaccio; Shayna E. Sacks,. Phone number is (212) 397-1000. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party OptumRx, Inc, optum. Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Attorney Brian D. Boone, Email address is brian.boone@alston.com. Phone number is (704) 444-1000. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. (Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Express Scripts Holding Company & Express Scripts, Inc.; Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell, Email address is adriana.riviere-badell@kobrekim.com. Phone number is (305) 967-6100. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}. (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party OptumRX, Inc.; Optum. Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Attorney Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, Email address is kim.chemerinsky@alston.com. Phone number is (213) 576-1000. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail} (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Navitus Holdings, LLC and Navitus Health Soultions, LLC; Attorney Nicholas S. Davis, Email address is nick,davis@tklaw.com. Phone number is (212) 751-3001. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail} (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CVS Health Corporation; Attorney Eric R. Delinsky, Email address is edelinsky@zuckerman.com. Phone number is (202) 778-1800. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Prime Therapeutics LLC; Attorney Robert J. Gilbertson, Email address is BGilbertson@GreeneEsel.com. Phone number is (612) 373-8330. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail} (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Navituse Holdings, LLC and Navitus Health Solutions, LLC; Attorney Timothy E. Hudson; Janelle L. Davis and Mackenzie Salenger, Email address is tim.hudson@tklaw.com; janelle.davis@tklaw.com; mckenzie.salenger@tklaw.com. Phone number is (214) 969-1700. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party OptumRx, Inc. Optum Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Attorney William H, Jordan and Caroline Strumph, Email address is bill.jordan@alston.com; caroline.strumph@alston.com. Phone number is (404) 881-7000. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Express Scripts Holding Company & Express Script,s Inc.; Attorney Steven G. Kobre, Email address is Steven.Kobre@kobrekim.com. Phone number is (212) 488-1200. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission Requirement sent via regular mail}.(mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CVS Health Corporation; Caremark Rx L.L.C.; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.; Caremark, L.L.C.; CaremarkPCS. L.L.C.; Attorney Shawn P. Naunton, Email address is snaunton @zuckerman.com. Phone number is (212) 704-9600. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail} (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CVS Health Corporation; Caremark Rx, L.L.C.; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.; Caremark, L.L.C.; CaremarkPCS, L.L.C; Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin, Email address is cocroinin@zuckerman.com. Phone number is (410) 332-0444. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. (mgh) {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Express Scripts Holding Company & Express Scripts, Inc.; Attorney Julian W. Park, Email address is julian.park@kobrekim.com. Phone number is (415) 582-4800. Admissions due by 7/17/2019. (mgh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/20/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/13/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by The City of Saratoga Springs. (mgh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga County Supreme Court, case number 2019-1802 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4786836) filed by CVS Health Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, Optum, Inc., Caremark L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., OptumRx Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Navitus Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3- Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Saratoga Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Represented By: Alana Montas
Represented By: Alexandria Swette
Represented By: Steven G Kobre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics LLC
Represented By: Jillian K. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas S Davis
Represented By: Timothy Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Represented By: Paul E. Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Represented By: Kacey E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Represented By: Alana Montas
Represented By: Alexandria Swette
Represented By: Steven G Kobre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: James M. Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas S Davis
Represented By: Timothy Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Group Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Represented By: Thomas S. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Saratoga Springs
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?