United States of America v. Whalen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, LVNV Funding LLC, White Birch Estates, Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York, John Doe, Mary Roe, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Barbara A. Whalen, Paul H. Whalen, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Village of Ballston Spa, Target National Bank, Louden Oaks, New York State Department of Labor, Saratoga Hospital and Stephanie Pelso
Case Number: 1:2019cv00849
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Stephanie Pelso served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Stephanie Pelso. (mgh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT to add Stephanie Pelso and remove Mary Roe, John Doe, XYZ Corporation, update amounts due and update Exhibit D against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., LVNV Funding LLC, Louden Oaks, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Saratoga Hospital, Target National Bank, Village of Ballston Spa, Barbara A. Whalen, Paul H. Whalen, White Birch Estates, Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York, Stephanie Pelso filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Amended Complaint, #2 Summons to New Party Stephanie Pelso)(LaBletta, Nicole)
August 20, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY pursuant to a telephone call from the filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed is an amended version and the clerk has changed the docket text to note that it is amended (kmp).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Amended) by United States of America. White Birch Estates served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 8/20/2019 to note that this amended(kmp).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On 8/2/2019, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants. The time for defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 8/26/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/19/2019. (nmk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019; LVNV Funding LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Louden Oaks served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019; New York State Department of Labor served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019; Saratoga Hospital served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Target National Bank served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019; Village of Ballston Spa served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Barbara A. Whalen served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Paul H. Whalen served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; White Birch Estates served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole)
July 17, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary Roe and XYZ Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk"s Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (mgh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., LVNV Funding LLC, Louden Oaks, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Target National Bank, The Saratoga Hosipal, Village of Ballston Spa, a Municipal Corporation, Barbara A. Whalen, Paul H. Whalen, White Birch Estates, Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA). N.A., #2 Summons Issued as to Louden Oaks, #3 Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC, #4 Summons Issed as to NYS Dept. of Taxation and Finance, #5 Summons Issued as to NYS Dept. of Labor, #6 Summons Issed as to The Saratoga Hospital, #7 Summons Issued as to Target National Bank, #8 Summons Issued as to Village of Ballston Spa, #9 Summons Issued as to White Birch Estates, #10 Summons Issued as to Workers' Compensation Board of the State of NY, #11 Summons Issued as to Paul Whalen)(mgh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., John Doe, LVNV Funding LLC, Louden Oaks, New York State Department of Labor, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Mary Roe, Target National Bank, The Saratoga Hosipal, Village of Ballston Spa, a Municipal Corporation, Barbara A. Whalen, Paul H. Whalen, White Birch Estates, Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Whalen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Birch Estates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workers' Compensation Board of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul H. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Ballston Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louden Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?