Brosnan et al v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Brosnan and Kevin C. Huston
Defendant: Katherine M. Roberts and Maureen E. Roberts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00860
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Maureen Roberts on August 7, 2019, filed by Stephen M. Brosnan, Kevin C. Huston. (Cusano, Gary)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Katherine Roberts on August 7, 2019, filed by Stephen M. Brosnan, Kevin C. Huston. (Cusano, Gary)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katherine M. Roberts, Maureen E. Roberts re #4 Answer to Complaint (Hurley, Paul)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Katherine M. Roberts, Maureen E. Roberts.(Hurley, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Katherine M. Roberts, Maureen E. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Katherine M. Roberts, Maureen E. Roberts (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4802235) filed by Stephen M. Brosnan, Kevin C. Huston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brosnan et al v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine M. Roberts
Represented By: Paul A. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen E. Roberts
Represented By: Paul A. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Brosnan
Represented By: Gary Cusano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin C. Huston
Represented By: Gary Cusano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?