Li v. Spa Nail 9, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Weidong Li
Defendant: Di Yang, Spa Nail 9, Inc., Peter Yang, Amy Yang and Andy Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00873
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Spa Nail 9, Inc. answer due 9/5/2019. (sfp, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Amy Lesch, AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York on August 15, 2019, filed by Weidong Li. (Troy, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 GENERAL ORDER 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/16/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)(kmp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Spa Nail 9, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Di Yang, #2 Summons issued as to Amy Yang, #3 Summons issued as to Andy Doe). (kmp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06118. electronically transferred when case opened
July 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Weidong Li. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United StatesDistrict Court for the Northern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/9/2019) (rro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John Troy dated 07/08/2019 re: Plaintiff's Letter Responding to OTSC. Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Weidong Li. (Schweitzer, Aaron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, by July 8, 2019: 1) Why his action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1391; and 2) Regardless of whether Plaintiff establishes that venue is proper pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1391, why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York under the doctrine of forum non conveniens. If Plaintiff fails to respond within the time allowed, fails to show that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York, or fails to show that this action should not be transferred under the doctrine of forum non conveniens, the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/1/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andy Doe, Spa Nail 9, Inc., Amy Yang, Di Yang. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Spa Nail 9, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Weidong Li.(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SPA NAIL 9, INC d/b/a Spa Nail 9; DI YANG a/k/a Peter Yang, AMY YANG, and ANDY DOE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Weidong Li. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andy Doe, Spa Nail 9, Inc., Amy Yang, Di Yang. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17169146)Document filed by Weidong Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Spa Nail 9, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Di Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spa Nail 9, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weidong Li
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?