Ford-Smith et al v. HMS Host Corp.
Plaintiff: Alfred Smith and Brenda F. Ford-Smith
Defendant: HMS Host Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00947
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by Brenda F. Ford-Smith, Alfred Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Time, #2 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law)(Fahrenkopf, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY filer notified Clerk that Attachment 2 of the #9 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion contained information not relevant to the case. Clerk replaced the document with the corrected document. {Service to be regenerated}. (pjh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by HMS Host Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) D's Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) P's Verified BP)(Torgerson, Shanna) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/24/2019) (pjh, ).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand, the IN PERSON Rule 16 scheduled for September 5, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton, NY is hereby RESCHEDULED without date. Once District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby rules on #7 Motion to Remand the IN PERSON Rule 16 will be rescheduled. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/4/2019. (jdp )
August 29, 2019 TEXT NOTICE re Motion #7 to Remand : Response to Motion remains due by 9/16/2019. Reply to Response to Motion remains due by 9/23/2019. This motion is returnable on 10/3/2019 before Chief Judge Suddaby on submission of the papers. No appearances are required. (sal )
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 9/16/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019. filed by Brenda F. Ford-Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) First Letter, #5 Exhibit(s) Second Letter, #6 Exhibit(s) Notice and Petition for Removal, #7 Memorandum of Law) (Fahrenkopf, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/29/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HMS Host Corp. (khr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HMS Host Corp. (khr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint by HMS Host Corp.(khr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by HMS Host Corp. (khr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 9007981218 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4820019) filed by HMS Host Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) #6 Affidavit of Service). Modified on 8/5/2019 (khr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford-Smith et al v. HMS Host Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Smith
Represented By: Matthew T. Fahrenkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda F. Ford-Smith
Represented By: Matthew T. Fahrenkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Host Corp.
Represented By: Shanna R. Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?