Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00950
Filed: August 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Norman A Mordue
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting the #5 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, as set forth in the directives herein. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be scheduled after a Defendant is named and served with specificity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/30/2019. (jmb)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Discovery for leave to serve a Third-Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP : Response to Motion due by 9/17/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2019 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All motions are on Submit unless otherwise directed. (jdp )
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for leave to serve a Third-Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2019 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019 filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #4 Declaration of Patrick Paige, #5 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Conway, Kevin)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Granting #3 Letter Request for permission for Plaintiff to file a Motion Seeking Leave to File a Third Party Subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and Granting request to adjourn any Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference until the Defendant is named and served. SO ORDEREDby Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/16/2019. (jdp )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Kevin T. Conway, Esq. for Malibu Media, LLC requesting Leave to File Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena submitted to Judge Norman A. Mordue . (Conway, Kevin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action regarding 7 Copyrights - Titles, Registration numbers and further details listed on the attached sheet. {Copy mailed to the Copyright Office by regular mail} (jmb)
August 5, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe infringer using IP address 100.4.176.37 in the #1 Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (jmb)
August 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against John Doe infringer using IP address 100.4.176.37 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4820856) filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IPP International U.G. Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Copyrights-In-Suit for IP Address 100.4.176.37, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?