Constantine v. Costello et al
Plaintiff: Bobbi A. Constantine
Defendant: Louis Costello, Town of Waterford Court and David Fusco
Case Number: 1:2019cv00989
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/18/2019. (Copy served on Plaintiff via regular mail)(rjb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion for Bobbi A. Constantine requesting to Dismiss the Acition without prejudice submitted to Judge Sannes. (mgh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louis Costello, David Fusco, Town of Waterford Court filed by Bobbi A. Constantine.(mgh) Modified on 8/27/2019 to note Title VII complaint form used this time with cause of action 42 USC section 2000e-5, not ADA as noted in the #1 Complaint. (jmb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. (mgh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobbi A. Constantine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Louis Costello, #2 Proposed Summons as to Town of Waterford Court) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (mgh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Costello, Town of Waterford Court filed by Bobbi A. Constantine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantine v. Costello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Waterford Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi A. Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?