Benson v. Gardner et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Benson
Defendant: Neil Gardner, Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe and Town of Stephentown
Case Number: 1:2019cv01004
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the #10 Letter Request by Defendant Neil Gardner for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Counsel are reminded that requests by counsel for separate defendants for extensions of deadlines must each set forth the good cause reasons for requesting the extensions even if the parties stipulate to an extension or if other parties to the case have made a similar request. Dkt. No. #10 is granted. Defendant Neil Gardner answer due 10/18/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/9/2019. (sg)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Letter Request by defendant Town of Stephentown for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Town of Stephentown answer due 10/18/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/9/2019. (sg)
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re: #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance: the text only of this docket entry has been corrected to reflect that this filing is a notice of attorney appearance. (sg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Brian D. Premo for Neil Gardner requesting Extension of time to Answer Complaint submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe . (Premo, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Brian D. Premo, Esq for Neil Gardner (Premo, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2019 -clerk's correction to follow. (sg, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Christopher P. Langlois for Town of Stephentown requesting Extension of Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading or Motion submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe . (Langlois, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Langlois on behalf of Town of Stephentown (Langlois, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Neil Gardner answer due 9/11/2019; Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe answer due 9/11/2019; Town of Stephentown answer due 9/11/2019. (see)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 served on Defendant Town of Stephentown c/o Stephanie Wagar, Town Clerk on August 21, 2019, filed by Ashley Benson. (Coffey, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 served on Defendant Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe c/o Neil Gardner on August 21, 2019, filed by Ashley Benson. (Coffey, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25 served on Defendant Neil Gardner on August 21, 2019, filed by Ashley Benson. (Coffey, Stephen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/12/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Neil Gardner, Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe, and Town of Stephentown. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe, #2 Summons for Town of Stephentown)(see)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Neil Gardner, Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe, and Town of Stephentown (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4837200) filed by Ashley Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Gardner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Gardner
Represented By: Brian D. Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner's Ice Cream & Coffee Shoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stephentown
Represented By: Christopher P. Langlois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Benson
Represented By: Stephen R. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?