Genao v. 32nd Precinct
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Defendant: 32nd Precinct
Case Number: 1:2019cv01035
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of 32nd Precinct against Elvin Genao. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (khr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION and ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/30/2019. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(khr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT executed by Elvin Genao re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Elvin Genao (khr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Elvin Genao. RECOMMENDED, that the Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice; and it is ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report- Recommendation and Order upon the parties to this action. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the parties have fourteen (14) days1 within which to file written objections to the foregoing report. Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court. FAILURE TO OBJECT TO THIS REPORT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WILL PRECLUDE APPELLATE REVIEW. Roldan v. Racette, 984 F.2d 85, 89 (2d Cir. 1993) (citing Small v. Secy of Health and Human Servs., 892 F.2d 15 (2d Cir. 1989)); see also 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); FED. R. CIV. P. 72 & 6(a). Objections to R&R due by 9/23/2019 Case Review Deadline 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/4/2019. (Copy served via regular and certified)(khr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/3/2019. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(khr)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/30/2019. (khr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elvin Genao. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (khr)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/22/2019. (Copy served via regular and certified)(khr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against 32nd Precinct filed by Elvin Genao.(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genao v. 32nd Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 32nd Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?