State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Chemours Company and Chemguard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01050
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:19-cv-02607, filed, 9/12/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Case transferred electronically to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #18. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel. (plp)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Horn, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 9/6/2019. {Clerk served Attorney by email on 8/23/2019} (jmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Tyco Fire Products, LP and Chemguard, Inc.; Attorney Thomas J. Herten and Nicole G. McDonough, Email address is therten@archerlaw.com and nmcdonough@archerlaw.com. Phone number is 201-498-8502. Admissions due by 9/6/2019. {Clerk served Attorney's by email on 8/23/2019}(jmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 10/1/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/24/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint) (jmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 904649-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4848089) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Michael S. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: John W Cerreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Michael S. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Brendan S. McGrath
Represented By: Philip M. Bein
Represented By: Matthew J. Sinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?